This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/16/2016 at 18:01:52 (UTC).

AJOLEZA, ALEJANDRO VS. CHU, WING SUN

Case Summary

On 02/25/2000 AJOLEZA, ALEJANDRO filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against CHU, WING SUN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Monrovia Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MICHAEL J. DUFFY. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0157

  • Filing Date:

    02/25/2000

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MICHAEL J. DUFFY

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

AJOLEZA AVELINA

AJOLEZA ALEJANDRO

AJOLEZA CLAUDIA A MINOR BY AND THROUGH HER GUARDIAN AD LITEM A

AJOLEZA MARIA

Cross Plaintiff and Defendant

CHU WING SUN

Cross Defendant and Plaintiff

AJOLEZA ALEJANDRO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

OLAN LAW CORPORATION - DAVID R. OLAN

Attorney at OLAN LAW CORPORATION

Cross Plaintiff and Defendant Attorney

RICHARDSON, BAMBRICK, CERMAK & FAIR - JUDI A. BAILEY

Attorney at RICHARDSON, BAMBRICK, CERMAK & FAIR

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/06/2002
  • CASE FILE ORDERED DESTROYED PER SECTION(S) 71008 AND/OR 68152 OF THE GOVERNMENT CODE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2001
  • CAUSE CALLED AT 01:30P M, IN DIV. 003 , HON. MICHAEL J. DUFFY, TEMPORARY JUDGE PRESIDING FOR HEARING ON ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. NO APPEARANCE BY OR FOR EITHER PARTY. THE COURT ORDERS CASE DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. PURSUANT TO 583.410 C.C.P. {COMPLAINT AND CROSS-COMPLAINT} CLERK TO GIVE NOTICE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2001
  • CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2001
  • REJECT SHEET SENT TO DAVID R. OLAN FOR REJECTION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL. CROSS COMPLAINT ON FILE. DISMISSAL MUST INCLUDE SIGNATURE OF ATTORNEY FOR CROSS-COMPLAINANT. SUBMITTED ON 02/14/01

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2001
  • CAUSE CALLED AT 01:30P M, IN DIV. 003 , HON. MICHAEL J. DUFFY, TEMPORARY JUDGE PRESIDING FOR PRE-TRIAL SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. MATTER SETTLED. COURT ORDERS MEMO TO SET STRICKEN.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2001
  • MATTER CONTINUED FOR HEARING RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE TO 02/27/01 AT 01:30P M, IN DIV. 003 . RE: DISMISSAL. CLERK TO GIVE NOTICE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2000
  • STATUS CONFERENCE QUESTIONNAIRE FILED. BY DEFENDANT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2000
  • MATTER SET FOR MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE ON 01/24/01 AT 02:30P M, IN DIV. 004 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2000
  • CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2000
  • MEMO TO SET CASE FOR JURY TRIAL FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2000
  • NEXT ACTION DUE 08/23/00 AT 09:00A M, IN DIV. KLM . MEMO TO SET. JURY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2000
  • NOTICE OF STATUS CONFERENCE AND ORDER TO APPEAR FILED AND MAILED TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL. MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON 09/15/00 AT 10:30A M, IN DIV. 004 . CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2000
  • ANSWER FILED OF (CHU, WING SUN) . CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED. CROSS-COMPLAINANT (CHU, WING SUN) . CROSS-DEFENDANT (AJOLEZA, ALEJANDRO) . RN SNI471395009

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2000
  • PROOF OF SERVICE RE: SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT FILED. SERVED AS TO (CHU, WING SUN) . COSTS OF $ 32.00 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2000
  • ORDER APPOINTING (AJOLEZA, ALEJANDRO) FOR (AJOLEZA, CLAUDIA) A MINOR BY AND THROUGH HER GUARDIAN AD LITEM (AJOLEZA, ALEJANDRO) , SIGNED AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2000
  • SUMMONS ISSUED .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2000
  • COMPLAINT FILED. RECEIPT # SNI439479003 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2000
  • PETITION AND APPOINTMENT OF (AJOLEZA, ALEJANDRO) GUARDIAN AD LITEM FOR (AJOLEZA, CLAUDIA) A MINOR BY AND THROUGH HER GUARDIAN AD LITEM (AJOLEZA, ALEJANDRO) , RECEIVED AND FORWARDED TO DIV. 004 FOR CONSIDERATION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2000
  • NEXT ACTION DUE 07/25/00 AT 09:00A M, IN DIV. KLM . POSSIBLE STATUS

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer OLAN DAVID RAPHAEL