This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/12/2016 at 15:38:27 (UTC).

ADVANTAGE FORD, INC. VS. KHIR, SHALABI

Case Summary

On 11/12/2002 ADVANTAGE FORD, INC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against KHIR, SHALABI. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Monrovia Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MICHAEL J. DUFFY. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****1114

  • Filing Date:

    11/12/2002

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MICHAEL J. DUFFY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SMALL CLAIMS ASSISTANCE WENDY M. HARRIS

Defendant

KHIR SHALABI

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/05/2012
  • DECLARATION RE: ACCRUED INTEREST FILED, $ 2044.50 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2012
  • APPLICATION FOR RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT RECEIVED AND NEW CASE FILE OPENED. ALL PAPERS PREVIOUSLY FILED UNDER THIS CASE NUMBER ARE PLACED INTO THE NEW ASSIGNED CASE NUMBER 12S00821 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2006
  • NOTICE OF REVOCATION OF PRIOR ASSIGNMENT OF JUDGMENT FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2006
  • ASSIGNMENT OF JUDGMENT TO SMALL CLAIMS ASSISTANCE, 560 W. MAIN ST., SUITE C#117, ALHAMBRA, CA91801 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2006
  • ASSOCIATION / APPOINTMENT OF ATTORNEYS FILED BY SMALL CLAIMS ASSISTANCE .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2006
  • REJECT SHEET SENT TO (ADVANTAGE FORD, INC.) ASSIGNED 7/28/03 SIERRA FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC. A CORPORATION FOR REJECTION OF ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF ASSIGNMENT OF JUDGMENT; SIERRA FINANCIAL SERVICES IS CURRENTLY THE ASSIGNEE. SUBMITTED ON 12/05/06

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2003
  • ASSIGNMENT OF JUDGMENT TO SIERRA FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2002
  • CAUSE CALLED AT 10:30A M, IN DIV. 003 , HON. MICHAEL J. DUFFY, TEMPORARY JUDGE PRESIDING FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING. PLAINTIFF APPEARING BY JEFF PIATT {FINANCE MANAGER}, SWORN AND TESTIFIES . NO APPEARANCE BY OR FOR DEFENDANT .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2002
  • EXHIBITS 1-CHECK #6128, RECEIVED INTO EVIDENCE FOR PLAINTIFF, AND RETURNED TO PLAINTIFF IN OPEN COURT .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2002
  • COURT ORDERS JUDGMENT ENTERED AS FOLLOWS :

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2002
  • JUDGMENT ENTERED AS A FINAL DISPOSITION ON 12/12/02 . FOR (ADVANTAGE FORD, INC.) . AGAINST (KHIR, SHALABI) . PRINCIPAL $ 2000.00 . COSTS $ 106.50 . TOTAL $ 2106.50 . EXECUTION STAYED 30 DAYS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2002
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED AND MAILED TO ALL PARTIES. JUDGMENT DEBTOR'S STATEMENT OF ASSETS MAILED TO (KHIR, SHALABI) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2002
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM FILED. SERVED AS TO (KHIR, SHALABI) BY SUB-SERVING RAFFET MOHAMMED CO-TENANT . MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON 12/12/02 AT 10:30A M, IN DIV. 003 COSTS OF $ 68.00 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2002
  • PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT FILED. RECEIPT # SNI439479006 . HEARING SET FOR 12/12/02 AT 10:30A M, IN DIV. 003

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2002
  • DECLARATION RE: NON-MILITARY SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less