This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/05/2016 at 11:49:22 (UTC).

7101 Alabama Llc Vs Marin, Pedro

Case Summary

On 03/12/2001 a Property - Residential Eviction case was filed by 7101 Alabama Llc against Marin Pedro in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Van Nuys Courthouse East located in Los Angeles, California.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****1659

  • Filing Date:

    03/12/2001

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Van Nuys Courthouse East

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

7101 Alabama Llc

Defendants

Marin Pedro

Marin Adolfo

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/08/2012
  • ****CASE DESTROYED PURSUANT TO GOVT. CODE 68151 - 68153 ****

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2001
  • WRIT RETURNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2001
  • APLICATION FILED AND ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2001
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION OF REAL PROPERTY ISSUED TO LA COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2001
  • STIPULATION JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2001
  • WRITTEN STIPULATION FOR JUDGMENT FILE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2001
  • DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2001
  • CLERK'S NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED AND MAILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2001
  • STIPULATION FOR JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2001
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT FOR ALL UNNAMED TENANTS SUBMITTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 03/20/2001
  • SUBMISSION FOR DEFAULT ONLY PENDING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2001
  • FEE WAIVER FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2001
  • RESPONSE FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2001
  • PROOF OF SERVICE TO COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2001
  • REQUEST FOR DEFAULT FILED AND ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2001
  • REQUEST FOR DEFAULT FILED AND NOT ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2001
  • ORIGINAL SUMMONS FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2001
  • MEMO TO SET CASE FOR TRIAL FILED-30 MIN(S)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2001
  • NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER MAILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2001
  • COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.