This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/01/2019 at 06:44:12 (UTC).

ZAMUDIO, NORA VS DECOFF, JASON

Case Summary

On 07/05/2017 ZAMUDIO, NORA filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against DECOFF, JASON. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****1136

  • Filing Date:

    07/05/2017

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ZAMUDIO NORA

Defendants

DECOFF SACHEL

DECOFF JASON

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BIRDSONG SAMUEL L.

 

Court Documents

Application for Writ of Possession

8/1/2017: Application for Writ of Possession

Writ - Return

8/25/2017: Writ - Return

Minute Order - (Hearing)

1/2/2018: Minute Order - (Hearing)

Writ of Execution - (Los Angeles)

8/9/2017: Writ of Execution - (Los Angeles)

Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

8/1/2017: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order

8/1/2017: Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order

Judgment - Unlawful Detainer

8/1/2017: Judgment - Unlawful Detainer

Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

8/1/2017: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/02/2018
  • Minute Order (Hearing)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2018
  • Hearing scheduled for 01/02/2018 at 08:30 AM in Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse at Department A14 updated: Result Date to 01/02/2018; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2017
  • Writ - Return ( Wholly Satisfied); Non-Party; Costs Credits: 0.00; Interest Credits: 0.00; Principal Credits: 0.00; Possession: Yes; Judgment Satisfaction Type: Wholly Satisfied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2017
  • Updated -- Writ of Execution (Los Angeles): Result: Returned and Filed; Result Date: 08/25/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2017
  • Writ of Execution (Los Angeles); Issued by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2017
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2017
  • Case reassigned to Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse in Department A14; Reason: Non-Stipulation to Judicial Officer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 08/01/2017 at 08:30 AM in Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse at Department A22 updated: Result Date to 08/01/2017; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2017
  • Updated -- Hearing: Location changed from Department A22 to Department A14

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 08/01/2017 at 08:30 AM in Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse at Department A14

    Read MoreRead Less
14 More Docket Entries
  • 07/12/2017
  • CLERK`S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE COMPLETED BY HAND DELIVERING A COPY OF THE ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER TO THE APPLICANT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2017
  • ANSWER FILED OF (DECOFF, JASON) , (DECOFF, SACHEL) . RECEIPT # WAIVER .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILING MAILED TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE RE: SUMMONS, COMPLAINT, PREJUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION FILED. SERVED AS TO (DECOFF, SACHEL) PER 07/06/17 . COSTS OF $ .00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT; PREJUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION FILED AS TO ANY AND ALL OCCUPANTS 07/06/17 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2017
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED. RN 07. Filing Fee: 240.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2017
  • SUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2017
  • SUMMONS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2017
  • NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT ON FILE. CASE IS ASSIGNED TO DEPT. A22 , HONORABLE JUDGE JOEL LOFTON .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2017
  • MATTER SET FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING ON 01/02/18 AT 08:30A M, IN DEPARTMENT A22 . .

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.