This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/23/2017 at 06:05:28 (UTC).

ZAKEN, KENERET VS. GONZALEZ, DAVID

Case Summary

On 05/09/2017 ZAKEN, KENERET filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against GONZALEZ, DAVID. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is BRIAN C. YEP. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0732

  • Filing Date:

    05/09/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

BRIAN C. YEP

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ZAKEN KENERET

Defendants

ALVARADO MARIA

GONZALEZ DAVID

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

H.G. LONG & ASSOCIATES - HELEN GRAYCE LONG ESQ

Attorney at H.G. LONG & ASSOCIATES

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/16/2017
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED FROM LOS ANGELES COUNTY UNSATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $ 120.00 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2017
  • JUDGMENT DEFAULT BY CLERK, CCP 1169, RESTITUTION OF THE PREMISES ONLY ENTERED AS FOLLOWS:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2017
  • JUDGMENT ENTERED ON 05/30/17 , FOR (ZAKEN, KENERET) , AGAINST (GONZALEZ, DAVID) , (ALVARADO, MARIA) , FOR RESTITUTION OF THE PREMISES LOCATED AT: 2523 E AVENUE J4 LANCASTER, CA 93535 , AND POSSESSION APPLIES TO ANY AND ALL UNNAMED OCCUPANTS IN THE PREMISES PURSUANT TO C.C.P. 415.46.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2017
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED TO LOS ANGELES COUNTY. RECEIPT # PAID . SASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT; PREJUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION FILED AS TO ANY AND ALL OCCUPANTS SUB 5-9-17 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE RE: SUMMONS, COMPLAINT, PREJUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION FILED. SERVED AS TO (GONZALEZ, DAVID) PER 5-9-17 . COSTS OF $ 75.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE RE: SUMMONS, COMPLAINT, PREJUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION FILED. SERVED AS TO (ALVARADO, MARIA) PER 5-9-17 . COSTS OF $ 75.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2017
  • REQUEST FILED AND DEFAULT ENTERED OF (GONZALEZ, DAVID) , (ALVARADO, MARIA) , ANY AND ALL OCCUPANTS . DECLARATION UNDER 585.5 CCP, DECLARATION PURSUANT TO 587 CCP, MEMO OF COSTS, AND DECLARATION OF NON-MILITARY STATUS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2017
  • APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION OF REAL PROPERTY FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2017
  • NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILING MAILED TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2017
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED. RN 05.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2017
  • SUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2017
  • SUMMONS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2017
  • NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT ON FILE. CASE IS ASSIGNED TO DEPT. A14 , HONORABLE BRIAN C. YEP .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2017
  • MATTER SET FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING ON 11/07/17 AT 08:30A M, IN DEPARTMENT A14 . .

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer LAW OFFICE OF JOHN BOUZANE - HELEN GRAYCE LONG ESQ