Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 02/01/2020 at 04:16:13 (UTC).

YUEYAN ZHAO VS FENWU UNIVERSITY OF ALTERNATIVE MEDICINE L.P.

Case Summary

On 01/09/2019 YUEYAN ZHAO filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against FENWU UNIVERSITY OF ALTERNATIVE MEDICINE L P. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Pasadena Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is ANNABELLE G. CORTEZ. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0205

  • Filing Date:

    01/09/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Pasadena Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

ANNABELLE G. CORTEZ

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ZHAO YUEYAN

Escondido, CA 92026

Defendant

FENWU UNIVERSITY OF ALTERNATIVE MEDICINE L.P.

L.P. 55 S. Raymond Ave. #105

Alhambra, CA 91801

 

Court Documents

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

2/15/2019: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 02/15/2019 and Judgment

2/15/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 02/15/2019 and Judgment

Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims) - Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

2/15/2019: Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims) - Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

2/15/2019: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

1/22/2019: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

1/9/2019: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/15/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 02/15/2019 and Judgment; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2019
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2019
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 02/15/2019 at 08:30 AM in Pasadena Courthouse at Department A updated: Result Date to 02/15/2019; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2019
  • DocketCourt orders judgment entered on the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Yueyan Zhao on 01/09/2019 as follows: Defendant Fenwu University of Alternative Medicine L.P. does not owe the plaintiff Yueyan Zhao any money on plaintiff's claim.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2019
  • DocketAuthorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2019
  • DocketMinute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2019
  • DocketUpdated -- Proof of Service by Substituted Service: As To Parties changed from Fenwu University of Alternative Medicine L.P. (Defendant) to Fenwu University of Alternative Medicine L.P. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Yueyan Zhao (Plaintiff); As to: Fenwu University of Alternative Medicine L.P. (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 01/15/2019; Service Cost: 40.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2019
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Yueyan Zhao (Plaintiff); As to: Fenwu University of Alternative Medicine L.P. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2019
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Annabelle G. Cortez in Department A Pasadena Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2019
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 02/15/2019 at 08:30 AM in Pasadena Courthouse at Department A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2019
  • DocketUpdated -- Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court: As To Parties changed from Fenwu University of Alternative Medicine L.P. (Defendant) to Fenwu University of Alternative Medicine L.P. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FENWU UNIVERSITY OF ALTERNATIVE MEDICINE L.P. DBA ALHAMBRA MEDICAL UNIVERSITY is a litigant