This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/15/2019 at 01:43:31 (UTC).

YU, S ELIZABETH VS 211 SOUTH WILSON HOMEOWNERS

Case Summary

On 10/01/2015 YU, S ELIZABETH filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against 211 SOUTH WILSON HOMEOWNERS. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Alhambra Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MICHAEL SMALL. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****6988

  • Filing Date:

    10/01/2015

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Alhambra Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MICHAEL SMALL

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

YU S ELIZABETH

Pasadena, CA 91102

Defendant

211 SOUTH WILSON HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION

211 South Wilson Avenue

Pasadena, CA 91106

 

Court Documents

Notice of Hearing on Small Claims Appeal

10/4/2016: Notice of Hearing on Small Claims Appeal

Notice of Appeal on Small Claims Judgment

9/30/2016: Notice of Appeal on Small Claims Judgment

Application and Order to Withdraw Exhibits

1/11/2017: Application and Order to Withdraw Exhibits

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

7/7/2016: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order of 08/18/2016 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets

8/18/2016: Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order of 08/18/2016 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets

Minute Order - (Ruling on Submitted Matter)

8/18/2016: Minute Order - (Ruling on Submitted Matter)

RETURNED MAIL - As to: 211 South Wilson Homeowners Association - Notice of entry of judgment 11/15/16

11/28/2016: RETURNED MAIL - As to: 211 South Wilson Homeowners Association - Notice of entry of judgment 11/15/16

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - by Sandra Wilmot

11/14/2016: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - by Sandra Wilmot

Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order of 11/15/2016 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets

11/15/2016: Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order of 11/15/2016 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets

Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

11/15/2016: Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

Minute Order - (Ruling on Submitted Matter)

11/15/2016: Minute Order - (Ruling on Submitted Matter)

Minute Order - (Trial De Novo - Small Claims Appeal)

11/14/2016: Minute Order - (Trial De Novo - Small Claims Appeal)

Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims) - Before Service

12/4/2015: Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims) - Before Service

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

10/1/2015: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

RETURNED MAIL

5/10/2016: RETURNED MAIL

Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) - ($40.00)

4/25/2016: Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) - ($40.00)

Minute Order

5/3/2016: Minute Order

Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims) - Before Service

2/9/2016: Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims) - Before Service

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/14/2017
  • DocketNotice of Destruction of Exhibits and Depositions; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2017
  • DocketUpdated -- Application and Order to Withdraw Exhibits: Result: Released; Result Date: 01/18/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2017
  • DocketApplication and Order to Withdraw Exhibits; Signed and Filed by: Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2016
  • DocketRETURNED MAIL As to: 211 South Wilson Homeowners Association - Notice of entry of judgment 11/15/16; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2016
  • DocketMinute Order (Ruling on Submitted Matter)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2016
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for Minute Order of 11/15/2016 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2016
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims); Entered by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2016
  • DocketCourt orders judgment after trial de novo entered for Plaintiff (YU, S ELIZABETH) against Defendant (211 SOUTH WILSON HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION) on the Plaintiff's Claim filed by YU, S ELIZABETH on 10/01/2015 (from ALH15G06988) for the principal amount of $2,500.00 and costs of $90.00 for a total of $2,590.00, joint and several.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2016
  • DocketUpdated -- On the Plaintiff's Claim filed by YU, S ELIZABETH on 10/01/2015 (from ALH15G06988), judgment entered on 08/18/2016 is vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2016
  • DocketOn the Plaintiff's Claim filed by YU, S ELIZABETH on 10/01/2015 (from ALH15G06988), judgment entered on 08/18/2016 as to (211 SOUTH WILSON HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION) is vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
20 More Docket Entries
  • 07/07/2016
  • DocketAuthorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims); Filed by: (211 SOUTH WILSON HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION) (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2016
  • DocketNOTICE/LETTER RE: MINUTE ORDER AND CLERK'S NOTICE OF RULING RETURNED AS TO (211 SOUTH WILSON HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION) DUE TO RETURN TO SENDER; INSUFFICIENT ADDRESS; UNABLE TO FORWARD .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2016
  • DocketCAUSE CALLED AT 08:30A M, IN DEPT. NE2 , HON. MICHAEL SMALL, JUDGE PRESIDING FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING. MATTER CONTINUED FOR SMALL CLAIMS TRIAL ON 07/07/16 AT 08:15A M, IN DEPT. NE2 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2016
  • DocketCASE FILE RETURNED TO SMALL CLAIMS OFFICE FROM COURTROOM .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2016
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM FILED. SERVED AS TO (211 SOUTH WILSON HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION) . MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON 05/03/16 AT 08:15A M, IN DEPT. NE2 . COSTS OF $ 40.00 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2016
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR POSTPONEMENT (BEFORE SERVICE) FILED .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2016
  • DocketMATTER RE-SCHEDULED FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING ON 05/03/16 AT 08:15A M, IN DEPT. NE2 . 2ND RE-SET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2015
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR POSTPONEMENT (BEFORE SERVICE) FILED .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2015
  • DocketMATTER RE-SCHEDULED FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING ON 02/19/16 AT 08:15A M, IN DEPT. NE2 . 1ST RE-SET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2015
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT FILED. RN ALH258280015. HEARING SET FOR 12/16/15 AT 08:15 AM IN DPT. NE2.

    Read MoreRead Less