This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/01/2019 at 07:27:50 (UTC).

YOUTHEMAN L.P. VS. BAEZA, AGUEDA

Case Summary

On 02/11/2014 YOUTHEMAN L P filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against BAEZA, AGUEDA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is RANDOLPH A. ROGERS. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0403

  • Filing Date:

    02/11/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Courthouse:

    Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

RANDOLPH A. ROGERS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

YOUTHEMAN L.P.

Defendant

BAEZA AGUEDA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KIMBALL, TIREY & ST. JOHN LLP - JESSICA S. WEISMAN

Attorney at KIMBALL, TIREY & ST. JOHN LLP

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/23/2015
  • CASE FILE ORDERED DESTROYED PER SECTION(S) 71008 AND/OR 68152 OF THE GOVERNMENT CODE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2015
  • PURSUANT TO COURT ORDER THE CASE FILE WAS DESTROYED ON 03/23/15 . CASE SET TO BE PURGED FROM THE SYSTEM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2014
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED FROM LOS ANGELES COUNTY UNSATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $ 110.00 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2014
  • APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION OF REAL PROPERTY FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2014
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED TO LOS ANGELES COUNTY. RECEIPT # PD . ATTY SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2014
  • JUDGMENT DEFAULT BY CLERK, CCP 1169, RESTITUTION OF THE PREMISES ONLY ENTERED AS FOLLOWS:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2014
  • JUDGMENT ENTERED ON 03/03/14 , FOR (YOUTHEMAN L.P.) , AGAINST (BAEZA, AGUEDA) , FOR RESTITUTION OF THE PREMISES LOCATED AT: 1041 EAST AVENUE K, #23 LANCASTER, CA 93535 , AND POSSESSION APPLIES TO ANY AND ALL UNNAMED OCCUPANTS IN THE PREMISES PURSUANT TO C.C.P. 415.46.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2014
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT; PREJUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION FILED AS TO ANY AND ALL OCCUPANTS 2/12/14 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2014
  • REQUEST FILED AND DEFAULT ENTERED OF (BAEZA, AGUEDA) , AND ANY AND ALL OCCUPANTS . DECLARATION UNDER 585.5 CCP, DECLARATION PURSUANT TO 587 CCP, MEMO OF COSTS, AND DECLARATION OF NON-MILITARY STATUS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2014
  • NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILING MAILED TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2014
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED. RN 013.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2014
  • SUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2014
  • SUMMONS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2014
  • NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT ON FILE. CASE IS ASSIGNED TO DEPT. A11 , HONORABLE RANDOLPH A. ROGERS .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2014
  • MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ON 08/12/14 AT 08:30A M, IN DEPT. A11 .

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where YOUTHEMAN L.P. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer WEISMAN, JESSICA S