This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/22/2021 at 05:19:54 (UTC).

YOUNG PARK VS S.KORET INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 11/13/2020 YOUNG PARK filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against S KORET INC , A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JAMES E. BLANCARTE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9574

  • Filing Date:

    11/13/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

JAMES E. BLANCARTE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PARK YOUNG

Defendant

S.KORET INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KIM JONG YUN

Defendant Attorney

CHANG YOUNG K

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses; Hear...)

8/5/2021: Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses; Hear...)

Motion to Deem RFA's Admitted - Motion to Deem RFA's Admitted

5/28/2021: Motion to Deem RFA's Admitted - Motion to Deem RFA's Admitted

Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses - Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses

5/28/2021: Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses - Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses

Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information - Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

3/12/2021: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information - Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

12/3/2020: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

Answer - Answer

12/15/2020: Answer - Answer

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/13/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint - Complaint

11/13/2020: Complaint - Complaint

Summons - Summons on Complaint

11/13/2020: Summons - Summons on Complaint

First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

11/13/2020: First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

11/13/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/17/2023
  • Hearing11/17/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 25 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • Hearing05/13/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 25 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • DocketMinute Order (Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses; Hear...)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • DocketHearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses scheduled for 08/05/2021 at 10:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25 updated: Result Date to 08/05/2021; Result Type to Held - Motion Denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • DocketHearing on Motion to Deem Request for Admissions Admitted scheduled for 08/05/2021 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25 updated: Result Date to 08/05/2021; Result Type to Held - Motion Denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • DocketHearing on Motion to Deem Request for Admissions Admitted scheduled for 08/05/2021 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • DocketHearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses scheduled for 08/05/2021 at 10:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • DocketMotion to Deem RFA's Admitted; Filed by: Young Park (Plaintiff); As to: S.Koret Inc., a California corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • DocketMotion to Compel Further Discovery Responses; Filed by: Young Park (Plaintiff); As to: S.Koret Inc., a California corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketAddress for Jong Yun Kim (Attorney) updated

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 12/15/2020
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: S.Koret Inc., a California corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Young Park (Plaintiff); As to: S.Koret Inc., a California corporation (Defendant); Service Date: 11/19/2020; Service Cost: 51.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Young Park (Plaintiff); As to: S.Koret Inc., a California corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Young Park (Plaintiff); As to: S.Koret Inc., a California corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Young Park (Plaintiff); As to: S.Koret Inc., a California corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 11/17/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/13/2022 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. James E. Blancarte in Department 25 Spring Street Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

b'

Case Number: 20STLC09574 Hearing Date: August 5, 2021 Dept: 25

PROCEEDINGS: (1)\r\nMOTION FOR ORDER DEEMING ADMITTED TRUTH OF FACTS

\r\n\r\n

\r\n\r\n

(2)\r\nMOTION TO COMPEL RESPONSES TO FORM INTERROGATORIES, SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES,\r\nAND REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS AND FOR SANCTIONS

\r\n\r\n

\r\n\r\n

MOVING PARTY: Plaintiff\r\nYoung Park

\r\n\r\n

RESP. PARTY: None

\r\n\r\n

\r\n\r\n

MOTION TO DEEM REQUESTS FOR ADMISSION ADMITTED; MOTION TO COMPEL\r\nRESPONSES TO INTERROGATORIES AND REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS; REQUEST\r\nFOR SANCTIONS

\r\n\r\n

(CCP §§ 2030.290; 2031.300; 2033.280)

\r\n\r\n

\r\n\r\n

TENTATIVE RULING:

\r\n\r\n

\r\n\r\n

Plaintiff’s (1) Motion for Order\r\nDeeming Admitted Truth of Facts and (2) Motion to Compel Responses to Form\r\nInterrogatories, Special Interrogatories, and Request for Production are\r\nDENIED.

\r\n\r\n

\r\n\r\n

SERVICE: \r\n

\r\n\r\n

\r\n\r\n

[X]\r\nProof of Service Timely Filed (CRC, rule 3.1300) OK

\r\n\r\n

[X]\r\nCorrect Address (CCP §§ 1013, 1013a) OK

\r\n\r\n

[X]\r\n16/21 Court Days Lapsed (CCP §§ 12c, 1005(b)) OK

\r\n\r\n

\r\n\r\n

OPPOSITION: None filed as of August 3,\r\n2021 [ ] Late [X]\r\nNone

\r\n\r\n

REPLY: None filed as\r\nof August 3, 2021 [ ] Late [X] None

\r\n\r\n

\r\n\r\n

ANALYSIS:

\r\n\r\n

\r\n\r\n

I. \r\nBackground\r\n& Discussion

\r\n\r\n

\r\n\r\n

On November 13, 2020, Plaintiff Young Park (“Plaintiff”)\r\nfiled an action against Defendant S.Koret, Inc. (“Defendant”). Defendant filed\r\nan Answer on December 15, 2020.

\r\n\r\n

\r\n\r\n

Plaintiff filed the instant (1) Motion for Order Deeming\r\nAdmitted Truth of Facts and (2) Motion to Compel Responses to Plaintiff’s Form\r\nInterrogatories, Special Interrogatories, and Request for Production (the\r\n“Motions”). No opposition was filed.

\r\n\r\n

\r\n\r\n

First, the Court notes that Plaintiff impermissibly filed\r\nfour separate requests for relief as two motions and thus only paid two filing\r\nfees for what should have been four separate motions. Combining discovery motions allows the moving\r\nparty to avoid paying the requisite filing fees. Filing fees are jurisdictional\r\nand it is mandatory for court clerks to demand and receive them. (See Duran v. St. Luke’s Hospital (2003)\r\n114 Cal.App.4th 457, 460.)

\r\n\r\n

\r\n\r\n

More importantly, Code of Civil\r\nProcedure section 86 limits discovery in limited jurisdiction actions to any\r\ncombination of 35 interrogatories with no subparts, demands to produce\r\ndocuments, and requests for admission with no subparts. (Code Civ.\r\nProc., § 94, subd. (a).) (Emphasis added.)

\r\n\r\n

\r\n\r\n

Here, Plaintiff propounded 33\r\nrequests for admission, 23 form interrogatories with subparts, 27 special\r\ninterrogatories with subparts, and 38 requests for production, totaling 121\r\nrequests not including subparts. (Motions, Kim Decl., ¶¶ 3, Exhs. A, B, C.) Because\r\nthe propounded discovery greatly exceeds what is permitted in limited\r\njurisdiction actions, Plaintiff’s Motions are DENIED.

\r\n\r\n

\r\n\r\n

II. \r\nConclusion\r\n& Order

\r\n\r\n

\r\n\r\n

For the foregoing reasons, Plaintiff’s\r\n(1) Motion for Order Deeming Admitted Truth of Facts and (2) Motion to Compel\r\nResponses to Form Interrogatories, Special Interrogatories, and Request for\r\nProduction are DENIED.

\r\n\r\n

\r\n\r\n

Moving party is ordered to give\r\nnotice.

'
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where S.KORET INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CHANG YOUNG K