This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/30/2017 at 10:36:38 (UTC).

YOUNG EUN CHOI VS ROMY TIFFANIE HAN

Case Summary

On 09/27/2017 YOUNG EUN CHOI filed a Property - Other Property Fraud lawsuit against ROMY TIFFANIE HAN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is ELAINE LU. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2458

  • Filing Date:

    09/27/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property Fraud

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

ELAINE LU

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CHOI YOUNG EUN

Defendant

HAN ROMY TIFFANIE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

NAKATSU DAVID YOSHIRO

 

Court Documents

Civil Case Cover Sheet

9/27/2017: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - on Complaint

9/27/2017: Summons - on Complaint

Complaint

9/27/2017: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

9/27/2017: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

9/27/2017: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/27/2017
  • Complaint; Filed by: Young Eun Choi (Plaintiff); As to: Romy Tiffanie Han (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • Request to Waive Court Fees; Filed by: Young Eun Choi (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Signed and Filed by: Clerk; As to: Young Eun Choi (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Young Eun Choi (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • Summons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • Case assigned to Hon. Elaine Lu in Department 77 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 03/27/2019 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 77

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • OSC - Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 09/30/2020 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 77

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: 17STLC02458    Hearing Date: November 25, 2020    Dept: 78

Superior Court of California

County of Los Angeles

Department 78

YOUNG EUN CHOI;

Plaintiff,

vs.

ROMY TIFFANIE HAN;

Defendant.

Case No.:

17STLC02458

Hearing Date:

November 25, 2020

[TENTATIVE] RULING RE:

Attorneys timothy yoo and joyce choi of the law firm bird marella, pc’s motion to be relieved as counsel for plaintiff and cross-defendant YOUNG EUN choi.

  1. MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL¿

    Cal. Code of Civ. Proc. section 284 states that “[t]he attorney in an action or special proceeding may be changed at any time before or after judgment or final determination” upon either consent of both client and attorney, or upon the order of the court under application of either the client of the attorney, after notice from one to the other. Cal. Rule of Court 3.1362 states the requirements for a motion to be relieved as counsel under Code Civ. Proc. section 284. No memorandum is required, but the motion must be accompanied by (1) a declaration stating why a motion has been brought instead of filing a consent (without compromising attorney-client confidentiality), (2) proof of service of the motion, and (3) all hearing dates scheduled in the action or proceeding, including the date of trial, if known. Additionally, “[t]he proposed order relieving counsel must be prepared on the Order Granting Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel--Civil (form MC-053) and must be lodged with the court with the moving papers.”¿

    The present motion is filed by Attorneys Timothy Yoo (“Yoo”) and Joyce Choi (“Choi”) of the law firm Bird, Marella, Boxer, Wolpert, Nessim, Drooks, Lincenberg & Rhow, P.C., attorneys for Plaintiff and Cross-Defendant Young Eun Choi. Yoo and Choi have submitted a declaration stating that there has been a breakdown in communication between the attorneys and client, Young Eun Choi. The motion complies with the above requirements. No oppositions have been filed to the Motion. 

    Accordingly, Attorney Attorneys Timothy Yoo and Joyce Choi of the law firm Bird, Marella, Boxer, Wolpert, Nessim, Drooks, Lincenberg & Rhow, P.C., attorneys for Plaintiff and Cross-Defendant Young Eun Choi’s Motion to be Relieved as Counsel is GRANTED.

    Date: November 25, 2020

    _______________________________

    Hon. Robert S. Draper

    Judge of the Superior Court

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer NAKATSU DAVID YOSHIRO