This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/06/2019 at 05:39:56 (UTC).

YIRAN ZHANG, ZHANG VS AUTOMAX MOTOR GROUP, INC.

Case Summary

On 10/10/2019 YIRAN ZHANG, ZHANG filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against AUTOMAX MOTOR GROUP, INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, West Covina Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is ANTY MORENO PETERS. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3642

  • Filing Date:

    10/10/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

ANTY MORENO PETERS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ZHANG YIRAN ZHANG DBA YIRAN ZHANG

Defendant

AUTOMAX MOTOR GROUP INC.

 

Court Documents

Notice (name extension) - Notice E-Filing Receipt of Documents

10/10/2019: Notice (name extension) - Notice E-Filing Receipt of Documents

Notice (name extension) - Notice E-Filing Payment Due

10/10/2019: Notice (name extension) - Notice E-Filing Payment Due

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

10/10/2019: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Notice of Rejection]

11/6/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Notice of Rejection]

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/03/2019
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 12/17/2019 at 08:30 AM in West Covina Courthouse at Department 6 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 12/03/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: Yiran Zhang, zhang (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • DocketOn the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Yiran Zhang, zhang on 10/10/2019, entered Request for Dismissal without prejudice filed by Yiran Zhang, zhang as to the entire action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for [Notice of Rejection]; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 12/17/2019 at 08:30 AM in West Covina Courthouse at Department 6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Anthony Moreno Peters in Department 6 West Covina Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2019
  • DocketNotice E-Filing Receipt of Documents; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2019
  • DocketNotice of E-Filing Acceptance (Small Claims); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2019
  • DocketNotice E-Filing Payment Due; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2019
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Yiran Zhang, zhang (Plaintiff); As to: AutoMax Motor Group, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AUTOMAX MOTOR GROUP INC. is a litigant