This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/22/2020 at 09:39:46 (UTC).

YESENIA PACHECO, ET AL. VS KATHERINE PATRICIA GUTIERREZ

Case Summary

On 06/06/2019 YESENIA PACHECO filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against KATHERINE PATRICIA GUTIERREZ. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is WENDY CHANG. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5425

  • Filing Date:

    06/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

WENDY CHANG

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

PACHECO YESENIA

CHAVEZ DAMIEN DANIEL

Defendant

GUTIERREZ KATHERINE PATRICIA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SHEKARCHIAN HALEH

 

Court Documents

Order to Deposit Money Into Blocked Account - Order to Deposit Money Into Blocked Account

2/18/2020: Order to Deposit Money Into Blocked Account - Order to Deposit Money Into Blocked Account

Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Petition to Confirm Minor's Compromise)

2/18/2020: Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Petition to Confirm Minor's Compromise)

Order Approving Compromise of Disputed Claim or Pending Action or Disposition of Proceeds of Judgme - Order Approving Compromise of Disputed Claim or Pending Action or Disposition of Proceeds of Judgm

2/18/2020: Order Approving Compromise of Disputed Claim or Pending Action or Disposition of Proceeds of Judgme - Order Approving Compromise of Disputed Claim or Pending Action or Disposition of Proceeds of Judgm

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order - Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

1/22/2020: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order - Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Clerk of Court Notice of Clerical Error and Correction - Clerk of Court Notice of Clerical Error and Correction

6/11/2019: Clerk of Court Notice of Clerical Error and Correction - Clerk of Court Notice of Clerical Error and Correction

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order - Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

10/15/2019: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order - Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem - Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem for Damien

7/15/2019: Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem - Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem for Damien

Petition to Approve Compromise of Disputed Claim - Petition to Approve Compromise of Disputed Claim

7/31/2019: Petition to Approve Compromise of Disputed Claim - Petition to Approve Compromise of Disputed Claim

Proof of Service by Mail - Proof of Service by Mail

7/31/2019: Proof of Service by Mail - Proof of Service by Mail

First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

6/6/2019: First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

6/6/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - Summons on Complaint

6/6/2019: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

6/6/2019: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Complaint - Complaint

6/6/2019: Complaint - Complaint

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/09/2022
  • Hearing06/09/2022 at 10:30 AM in Department 26 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • Hearing12/03/2020 at 08:30 AM in Department 26 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • DocketUpdated -- Order to Deposit Money Into Blocked Account: Status Date changed from 08/09/2019 to 02/18/2020; Filed By: YESENIA PACHECO (Plaintiff),DAMIEN DANIEL CHAVEZ (Plaintiff); Result: Signed and Filed; Result Date: 02/18/2020; As To Parties changed from KATHERINE PATRICIA GUTIERREZ (Defendant) to KATHERINE PATRICIA GUTIERREZ (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • DocketUpdated -- Order to Deposit Money Into Blocked Account: Status changed from Filed to Signed and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • DocketOrder Approving Compromise of Disputed Claim or Pending Action or Disposition of Proceeds of Judgment for Minor or Person With a Disability (Miscellaneous); Filed by: YESENIA PACHECO (Plaintiff); DAMIEN DANIEL CHAVEZ (Plaintiff); As to: KATHERINE PATRICIA GUTIERREZ (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • DocketUpdated -- Order Approving Compromise of Disputed Claim or Pending Action or Disposition of Proceeds of Judgment for Minor or Person With a Disability (Miscellaneous): Status changed from Filed to Signed and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • DocketMinute Order (Hearing on Petition to Confirm Minor's Compromise)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • DocketHearing on Petition to Confirm Minor's Compromise scheduled for 02/18/2020 at 10:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 updated: Result Date to 02/18/2020; Result Type to Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketNotice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketReset - Court Unavailable, Hearing on Petition to Confirm Minor's Compromise scheduled for 01/27/2020 at 10:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 Not Held - Rescheduled by Court was rescheduled to 02/18/2020 10:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 07/15/2019
  • DocketApplication And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem for Damien; Signed and Filed by: YESENIA PACHECO (Plaintiff); As to: DAMIEN DANIEL CHAVEZ (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2019
  • DocketClerk of Court Notice of Clerical Error and Correction; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 12/03/2020 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 06/09/2022 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Wendy Chang in Department 94 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: YESENIA PACHECO (Plaintiff); DAMIEN DANIEL CHAVEZ (Plaintiff); As to: KATHERINE PATRICIA GUTIERREZ (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: YESENIA PACHECO (Plaintiff); DAMIEN DANIEL CHAVEZ (Plaintiff); As to: KATHERINE PATRICIA GUTIERREZ (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2019
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: YESENIA PACHECO (Plaintiff); DAMIEN DANIEL CHAVEZ (Plaintiff); As to: KATHERINE PATRICIA GUTIERREZ (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2019
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: 19STLC05425    Hearing Date: February 18, 2020    Dept: 26

TENTATIVE RULING:

On June 6, 2019, Plaintiff Yesenia Pacheco (“Petitioner”) and minor Plaintiff Damien Daniel Chavez (“Claimant”), through his guardian ad litem filed the instant action for motor vehicle negligence against Defendant Katherine Patricia Gutierrez (“Defendant”). On July 15, 2019, the Court granted Petitioner’s application to be appointed Claimant’s guardian ad litem. Petitioner filed the instant Petition to Approve Compromise of Disputed Claim on Behalf of a Minor on July 31, 2019.

Court approval is required for all settlements of a minor’s claim. (See Prob. Code §§ 3500, 3600, et seq.; Code Civ. Proc., § 372.) “[A] minor, a person who lacks legal capacity to make decisions, . . . shall appear either by a guardian or conservator of the estate or by a guardian ad litem appointed by the court in which the action or proceeding is pending, or by a judge thereof, in each case.” (CCP § 372, emphasis added.)

Having reviewed the Petition, the Court finds it to be complete and provides for a reasonable settlement to minor Plaintiff based on his injuries and prognosis. Proposed orders have been filed concurrently. Therefore, the Petition to Approve Minor’s Compromise of Disputed Claim is GRANTED.

Moving party to give notice.