This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/26/2016 at 05:45:21 (UTC).

YELLEN, THOMAS VS AAA T.L.C. HEALTH CARE INC.

Case Summary

On 04/05/2013 YELLEN, THOMAS filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against AAA T L C HEALTH CARE INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Van Nuys Courthouse East located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****1795

  • Filing Date:

    04/05/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Courthouse:

    Van Nuys Courthouse East

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

YELLEN THOMAS

Defendants

AAA T.L.C. HEALTH CARE INC.

AAA T. L. C. HEALTH CARE INC.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/01/2014
  • CASE FILE ORDERED DESTROYED PER SECTION(S) 71008 AND/OR 68152 OF THE GOVERNMENT CODE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2013
  • DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE FILED FOR THE ENTIRE ACTION AS TO ALL DEFENDANT{S} AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION{S}. SIGNED BY THOMAS YELLEN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2013
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM FILED. SERVED AS TO (AAA T.L.C. HEALTH CARE INC.) BY SUB-SERVING MICHELLE, APPROX 5'6, WEIGHT 230, AGE 55, HAIR COLOR BLACK . COSTS OF $ 0.00 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2013
  • AUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF PARTY FILED AS TO (YELLEN, THOMAS) . THOMAS YELLEN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2013
  • PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT FILED. RECEIPT # LAV485216013 . HEARING SET FOR 05/29/13 AT 08:30A M, IN DEPT. NWZ

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AAA T.L.C. HEALTH CARE INC is a litigant