This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/07/2017 at 10:49:13 (UTC).

YB REAL ESTATE PROPERTIES I LLC VS BOWEN, PAIGE BONNE

Case Summary

On 05/05/2017 YB REAL ESTATE PROPERTIES I LLC filed a Property - Commercial Eviction lawsuit against BOWEN, PAIGE BONNE. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****4520

  • Filing Date:

    05/05/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Commercial Eviction

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

YB REAL ESTATE PROPERTIES I LLC

Defendant

BOWEN PAIGE BONNE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MELLER & FLOYD

 

Court Documents

Unknown

8/9/2017: Unknown

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/10/2017
  • Writ of Execution (Possession); Issued by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2017
  • OSC - Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 11/01/2017 at 08:30 AM in at Civil Clerk's Office Not Held - Vacated by Court on 08/09/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2017
  • Default judgment entered for Plaintiff YB REAL ESTATE PROPERTIES I LLC against Defendant BOWEN, PAIGE BONNE on the Complaint filed by YB REAL ESTATE PROPERTIES I LLC on 05/05/2017 for a total of $0.00.; Restitution and possession of the premises located at 222 W PICO BLVD, LOS ANGELES, CA 90015 is granted for plaintiff(s)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2017
  • Default Judgment - Unlawful Detainer; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2017
  • Application for Writ of Possession; Filed by: YB REAL ESTATE PROPERTIES I LLC (Plaintiff); Daily Rental Value: 216.66

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2017
  • Proof of Personal Service; Filed by: YB REAL ESTATE PROPERTIES I LLC (Plaintiff); As to: PAIGE BONNE BOWEN (Defendant); Service Date: 07/14/2017; Service Cost: 0.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2017
  • Request for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by: YB REAL ESTATE PROPERTIES I LLC (Plaintiff); As to: PAIGE BONNE BOWEN (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2017
  • Default entered as to PAIGE BONNE BOWEN; On the Complaint filed by YB REAL ESTATE PROPERTIES I LLC on 05/05/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2017
  • MEMO TO SET CASE FOR TRIAL FILED-20 MIN(S) * * REJECTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2017
  • SUBMISSION FOR DEFAULT AND JUDGMENT PENDING *** DEFAULT PROCESSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2017
  • MEMO TO SET REJECTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE TO COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2017
  • REQUEST FOR DEFAULT FILED AND NOT ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2017
  • NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER MAILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2017
  • OSC SET 11/01/17, 08:30 AM, DEPT. CLK PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2017
  • COMPLAINT FILED - U.D. COMMERCIAL Filing Fee: 240.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2017
  • SUMMONS FILED

    Read MoreRead Less