Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/06/2019 at 01:30:13 (UTC).

XOCHITL RUBIO RIOS, ET AL. VS DANIELA CAESAR-RODEN

Case Summary

On 11/26/2018 XOCHITL RUBIO RIOS filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against DANIELA CAESAR-RODEN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Van Nuys Courthouse East located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is RICHARD F. WALMARK. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6136

  • Filing Date:

    11/26/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Van Nuys Courthouse East

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

RICHARD F. WALMARK

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

GARCIA MEZA JOSE ANTONIO DBA JOSE GARCIA

RIOS XOCHITL RUBIO AKA XOCHITL RUBIO

Defendant

CAESAR-RODEN DANIELA

 

Court Documents

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

11/26/2018: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information - Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

4/3/2019: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information - Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

4/3/2019: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

Notice of Postponement - Notice of Postponement

1/23/2019: Notice of Postponement - Notice of Postponement

Notice (name extension) - Notice E-Filing Payment Due

11/26/2018: Notice (name extension) - Notice E-Filing Payment Due

Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) - Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

1/25/2019: Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) - Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims) - Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)

1/23/2019: Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims) - Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)

Notice (name extension) - Notice E-Filing Receipt of Documents

11/26/2018: Notice (name extension) - Notice E-Filing Receipt of Documents

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/03/2019
  • Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by: Daniela Caesar-Roden (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2019
  • Request for Dismissal; Filed by: Xochitl Rubio Rios (Plaintiff); Jose Antonio Garcia Meza (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2019
  • On the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Xochitl Rubio Rios, et al. on 11/26/2018, entered Request for Dismissal without prejudice filed by Jose Antonio Garcia Meza and Xochitl Rubio Rios as to the entire action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2019
  • Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims); Filed by: Xochitl Rubio Rios (Plaintiff); Jose Antonio Garcia Meza (Plaintiff); As to: Daniela Caesar-Roden (Defendant); Service Cost: 0.00; Service Cost Waived: No; Service Date: 01/19/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2019
  • Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims); Filed by: Daniela Caesar-Roden (Defendant); Has the Claim Been Served?: Yes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2019
  • Notice of Postponement; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2019
  • Over the objection of defendant, Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 02/04/2019 at 08:30 AM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department P Not Held - Rescheduled by Party was rescheduled to 04/03/2019 08:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2018
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 02/04/2019 at 08:30 AM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department P

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2018
  • Case assigned to Hon. Richard F. Walmark in Department P Van Nuys Courthouse East

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2018
  • Notice E-Filing Receipt of Documents; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2018
  • Notice of E-Filing Acceptance (Small Claims); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2018
  • Notice E-Filing Payment Due; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2018
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Xochitl Rubio Rios (Plaintiff); Jose Antonio Garcia Meza (Plaintiff); As to: Daniela Caesar-Roden (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less