This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/19/2019 at 17:28:56 (UTC).

XIAO FANG HE VS NICHOLAS MARTINEZ

Case Summary

On 07/13/2018 XIAO FANG HE filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against NICHOLAS MARTINEZ. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, West Covina Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is SUSAN J. TOWNSEND. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1681

  • Filing Date:

    07/13/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

SUSAN J. TOWNSEND

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HE XIAO FANG

Defendant

MARTINEZ NICHOLAS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WHITEHEAD FRANK HENRY III

Attorney at Frank H Whitehead, III, Esq

107 W. Huntington Drive Ste. D

Arcadia, CA 91007

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - (Hearing on Ex Parte Application To Vacate Default and Default...)

10/1/2018: Minute Order - (Hearing on Ex Parte Application To Vacate Default and Default...)

Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order (Hearing on Ex Parte Application To Vacate Default and Default...) of 10/01/2018

10/1/2018: Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order (Hearing on Ex Parte Application To Vacate Default and Default...) of 10/01/2018

Property Owner/Landlord Only Hearing Notice

7/13/2018: Property Owner/Landlord Only Hearing Notice

Civil Case Cover Sheet

7/13/2018: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - on Complaint

7/13/2018: Summons - on Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

7/13/2018: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Complaint

7/13/2018: Complaint

Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - (Nicholas Martinez)

7/13/2018: Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - (Nicholas Martinez)

Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - (ALL OCCUPANTS)

7/13/2018: Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - (ALL OCCUPANTS)

Motion to Quash Service of Summons - ; Supporting Memorandum; Defendants Declaration By Special Appearance

7/23/2018: Motion to Quash Service of Summons - ; Supporting Memorandum; Defendants Declaration By Special Appearance

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

7/23/2018: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

Minute Order - (Hearing on Motion to Quash Service of Summons)

7/30/2018: Minute Order - (Hearing on Motion to Quash Service of Summons)

Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Quash Service of Summons) of 07/30/2018

7/30/2018: Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Quash Service of Summons) of 07/30/2018

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

8/24/2018: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

8/24/2018: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Personal Service

8/24/2018: Proof of Personal Service

Writ of (name extension) - Possession (mailed)

8/31/2018: Writ of (name extension) - Possession (mailed)

Application for Writ of Possession

8/31/2018: Application for Writ of Possession

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/04/2018
  • DocketWrit - Return ( Wholly Satisfied);; Costs Credits: 0.00; Interest Credits: 0.00; Principal Credits: 0.00; Possession: Yes; Judgment Satisfaction Type: Wholly Satisfied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2018
  • DocketEx Parte Application To Vacate Default And Default Judgment; Memorandum of Points and Authorities; Declaration of Nicholas Martinez; Exhibit A; Filed by: Nicholas Martinez (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2018
  • DocketHearing on Ex Parte Application To Vacate Default and Default Judgment scheduled for 10/01/2018 at 01:30 PM in West Covina Courthouse at Department 6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2018
  • DocketUpdated -- Ex Parte Application To Vacate Default And Default Judgment; Memorandum of Points and Authorities; Declaration of Nicholas Martinez; Exhibit A; Order: Name Extension changed from To Vacate Default And Default Judgment; Memorandum of Points and Authorities; Declaration of Nicholas Martinez; Exhibit A to To Vacate Default And Default Judgment; Memorandum of Points and Authorities; Declaration of Nicholas Martinez; Exhibit A; Order; As To Parties: removed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2018
  • DocketUpdated -- Ex Parte Application To Vacate Default And Default Judgment; Memorandum of Points and Authorities; Declaration of Nicholas Martinez; Exhibit A; Order: Filed By: Nicholas Martinez (Defendant); Result: Denied; Result Date: 10/01/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2018
  • DocketMinute Order (Hearing on Ex Parte Application To Vacate Default and Default...)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2018
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Hearing on Ex Parte Application To Vacate Default and Default...) of 10/01/2018; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2018
  • DocketHearing on Ex Parte Application To Vacate Default and Default Judgment scheduled for 10/01/2018 at 01:30 PM in West Covina Courthouse at Department 6 updated: Result Date to 10/01/2018; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2018
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Cashiers Check in the amount of $500.00; Filed by: Nicholas Martinez (Defendant); As to: Xiao Fang He (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2018
  • DocketUpdated -- Ex Parte Application For Stay of Execution; Memorandum of Points and Authorities; Declaration of Nicholas Martinez: Result: Denied; Result Date: 09/21/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
20 More Docket Entries
  • 07/23/2018
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Signed and Filed by: Clerk; As to: Nicholas Martinez (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2018
  • DocketMotion to Quash Service of Summons; Supporting Memorandum; Defendants Declaration By Special Appearance; Filed by: Nicholas Martinez (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Xiao Fang He (Plaintiff); As to: Nicholas Martinez (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2018
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Xiao Fang He (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2018
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2018
  • DocketProperty Owner/Landlord Only Hearing Notice; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2018
  • DocketNotice of Unlawful Detainer mailed 07/16/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2018
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Susan J. Townsend in Department 6 West Covina Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2018
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 09/24/2018 at 08:30 AM in West Covina Courthouse at Civil Clerk's Office

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer WHITEHEAD FRANK HENRY III