Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/23/2019 at 07:04:43 (UTC).

XENON INVESTMENT CORPORATION VS ANDY CHEN, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 03/15/2019 XENON INVESTMENT CORPORATION filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against ANDY CHEN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Santa Monica Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0576

  • Filing Date:

    03/15/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Santa Monica Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

XENON INVESTMENT CORPORATION

Defendants

CHEN ANDY

MUNOZ PABLO M AKA PABLO MUNOZ

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BRENNAN MICHAEL A.

 

Court Documents

Property Owner/Landlord Only Hearing Notice - Property Owner/Landlord Only Hearing Notice

3/15/2019: Property Owner/Landlord Only Hearing Notice - Property Owner/Landlord Only Hearing Notice

Complaint - Complaint

3/15/2019: Complaint - Complaint

Summons - Summons on Complaint

3/15/2019: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

3/15/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

3/15/2019: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) (Pablo m Munoz)

3/19/2019: Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) (Pablo m Munoz)

Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) (ALL OCCUPANTS)

3/19/2019: Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) (ALL OCCUPANTS)

Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) (Andy Chen)

3/19/2019: Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) (Andy Chen)

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

3/27/2019: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

3/27/2019: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

3/27/2019: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

3/27/2019: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

4/9/2019: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Default Judgment - Unlawful Detainer - Default Judgment - Unlawful Detainer

4/10/2019: Default Judgment - Unlawful Detainer - Default Judgment - Unlawful Detainer

Application for Writ of Possession - Application for Writ of Possession

4/12/2019: Application for Writ of Possession - Application for Writ of Possession

Writ - Return - Writ - Return

5/10/2019: Writ - Return - Writ - Return

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/10/2019
  • DocketUpdated -- Writ of Execution (LOS ANGELES): Filed By: XENON INVESTMENT CORPORATION (Plaintiff); Result: Returned and Filed; Result Date: 05/10/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2019
  • DocketWrit - Return ( Wholly Satisfied);; Costs Credits: 145.00; Interest Credits: 0.00; Principal Credits: 0.00; Possession: No; Judgment Satisfaction Type: Wholly Satisfied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2019
  • DocketWrit of Execution (LOS ANGELES); Issued by: XENON INVESTMENT CORPORATION (Plaintiff); As to: Andy Chen (Defendant); Pablo m Munoz (Defendant); County: LOS ANGELES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2019
  • DocketUpdated -- Writ of Execution (LOS ANGELES): Name Extension changed from Possession of Real Property to (LOS ANGELES); Document changed from Writ of (name extension) to Writ of Execution; As To Parties changed from Andy Chen (Defendant), Pablo m Munoz (Defendant) to Pablo m Munoz (Defendant), Andy Chen (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2019
  • DocketApplication for Writ of Possession; Filed by: XENON INVESTMENT CORPORATION (Plaintiff); Daily Rental Value: 62.46

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • DocketUpdated -- Proof of Service by Substituted Service: As To Unnamed Occupants: Yes; As To Parties: removed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • DocketUpdated -- Default Judgment - Unlawful Detainer: As To Unnamed Occupants: Yes; As To Parties changed from Pablo m Munoz (Defendant), Andy Chen (Defendant) to Andy Chen (Defendant), Pablo m Munoz (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • DocketDefault Judgment - Unlawful Detainer; Filed by: XENON INVESTMENT CORPORATION (Plaintiff); As to: Andy Chen (Defendant); Pablo m Munoz (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • DocketDefault judgment by Clerk entered for Plaintiff XENON INVESTMENT CORPORATION against Defendant Pablo m Munoz AKA Pablo Munoz and Defendant Andy Chen on the Complaint filed by XENON INVESTMENT CORPORATION on 03/15/2019 for a total of $0.00.; Judgment for possession is granted against all unnamed occupants pursuant to Code of Civil Procedure section 415.46.; Restitution and possession of the premises located at 652 VETERAN AVE., #15, LOS ANGELES, CA 90024 is granted for plaintiff(s);; The Rental Agreement under which the property is held is hereby cancelled.; Lease Agreement under which the property is held is hereby forfeited.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 05/24/2019 at 08:30 AM in Santa Monica Courthouse at Civil Clerk's Office Not Held - Vacated by Court on 04/10/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 03/27/2019
  • DocketDefault entered as to Andy Chen; Pablo m Munoz; On the Complaint filed by XENON INVESTMENT CORPORATION on 03/15/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2019
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by: XENON INVESTMENT CORPORATION (Plaintiff); As to: Andy Chen (Defendant); Pablo m Munoz (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • DocketNotice of Unlawful Detainer mailed 03/19/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 05/24/2019 at 08:30 AM in Santa Monica Courthouse at Civil Clerk's Office

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2019
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Lisa K Sepe-Wiesenfeld in Department S Santa Monica Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: XENON INVESTMENT CORPORATION (Plaintiff); As to: Andy Chen (Defendant); Pablo m Munoz (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2019
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: XENON INVESTMENT CORPORATION (Plaintiff); As to: Andy Chen (Defendant); Pablo m Munoz (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: XENON INVESTMENT CORPORATION (Plaintiff); As to: Andy Chen (Defendant); Pablo m Munoz (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2019
  • DocketProperty Owner/Landlord Only Hearing Notice; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where XENON INVESTMENT CORP. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BRENNAN MICHAEL . A