This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/03/2019 at 04:09:35 (UTC).

WORLDWIDE JET CHARTER, INC. VS EDGAR MORALES

Case Summary

On 10/01/2019 WORLDWIDE JET CHARTER, INC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against EDGAR MORALES. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is SERENA R. MURILLO. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9089

  • Filing Date:

    10/01/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

SERENA R. MURILLO

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WORLDWIDE JET CHARTER INC.

Defendant

MORALES EDGAR

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MOTLEY DALE ELLIS

 

Court Documents

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

11/4/2019: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

Notice of Rejection - Pleadings - Notice of Rejection - Pleadings

11/13/2019: Notice of Rejection - Pleadings - Notice of Rejection - Pleadings

Notice of Rejection - Pleadings - Notice of Rejection - Pleadings

11/26/2019: Notice of Rejection - Pleadings - Notice of Rejection - Pleadings

Complaint - Complaint

10/1/2019: Complaint - Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

10/1/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - Summons on Complaint

10/1/2019: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

10/1/2019: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

10/1/2019: First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/04/2022
  • Hearing10/04/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 94 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • Hearing03/30/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 94 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • DocketNotice of Rejection - Pleadings; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2019
  • DocketNotice of Rejection - Pleadings; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2019
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: WORLDWIDE JET CHARTER, INC. (Plaintiff); As to: EDGAR MORALES (Defendant); Service Date: 10/21/2019; Service Cost: 99.95; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2019
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 03/30/2021 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 10/04/2022 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2019
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Serena R. Murillo in Department 94 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: WORLDWIDE JET CHARTER, INC. (Plaintiff); As to: EDGAR MORALES (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2019
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: WORLDWIDE JET CHARTER, INC. (Plaintiff); As to: EDGAR MORALES (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: WORLDWIDE JET CHARTER, INC. (Plaintiff); As to: EDGAR MORALES (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2019
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: 19STLC09089    Hearing Date: February 09, 2021    Dept: 26


Case Number: 20STLC02459    Hearing Date: February 09, 2021    Dept: 26

Real v. La Crescenta Chateau, Inc., et al.

MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

(CCP § 437c)

TENTATIVE RULING:

Plaintiff Jesenia Real’s Motion for Summary Judgment is PLACED OFF CALENDAR. Based on the relief sought in the Complaint, this case is reclassified as an unlimited civil case and transferred to the Reclassification/Transfer Desk for collection of fees and reassignment of the case to an Independent Calendar Court. Plaintiff is ordered to pay the reclassification fee within ten (10) days.

ANALYSIS:

On March 12, 2020, Plaintiff Jesenia Real (“Plaintiff”) filed the instant action for injunctive relief against Defendant La Cresenta Chateau (“Defendant”). The Complaint seeks to compel Defendant’s compliance with Cal. Labor Code section 1198.5. On October 27, 2020, Plaintiff filed the instant Motion for Summary Judgment.

As a limited jurisdiction court, this Court has no authority to issue declaratory or injunctive relief, subject to certain exceptions that are not applicable here. (See Code Civ. Proc., §§ 85, 86.) Based on the relief sought in the Complaint and pursuant to Code of Civil Procedure section 403.040, subdivision (a), this case is reclassified as an unlimited civil case and transferred to the Reclassification/Transfer Desk for collection of fees and reassignment of the case to an Independent Calendar Court. Plaintiff is ordered to pay the reclassification fee within ten (10) days.

Court clerk to give notice.

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer MOTLEY DALE ELLIS