This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/16/2019 at 10:46:55 (UTC).

WOODMERE CHB VS ZERO MOTORCYCLES

Case Summary

On 06/16/2017 WOODMERE CHB filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against ZERO MOTORCYCLES. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Norwalk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is THOMAS D. LONG. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****1928

  • Filing Date:

    06/16/2017

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

THOMAS D. LONG

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WOODMERE CHB INC. DBA MW TRANSPORT

Defendant

ZERO MOTORCYCLES INC. A DELAWARE CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BOROS DAVID

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

9/13/2017: Request for Dismissal

Notice of Settlement (Collection Case) - UNCONDITIONAL

8/28/2017: Notice of Settlement (Collection Case) - UNCONDITIONAL

Proof of Personal Service

7/28/2017: Proof of Personal Service

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/19/2017
  • DocketOSC - Hearing (name extension) scheduled for 06/01/2020 at 08:30 AM in at Department B Not Held - Vacated by Court on 09/19/2017

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2017
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: (WOODMERE CHB) INC. (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2017
  • DocketRequest for dismissal With Prejudice entered as to entire action

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/28/2017
  • DocketNotice of Settlement (Collection Case) UNCONDITIONAL; Filed by: (WOODMERE CHB) INC. (Plaintiff); As to: (ZERO MOTORCYCLES) INC. A DELAWARE CORPORATION (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/28/2017
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: (WOODMERE CHB) INC. (Plaintiff); As to: (ZERO MOTORCYCLES) INC. A DELAWARE CORPORATION (Defendant); Service Date: 07/20/2017; Service Cost: 103.90; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/16/2017
  • DocketCOLLECTIONS CASE COMPLAINT FILED PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740. RN NOR508390015. Filing Fee: 225.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/16/2017
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/16/2017
  • DocketSUMMONS FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/16/2017
  • DocketOSC HEARING IS SET FOR 06/01/20 AT 08:30A M., IN DEPARTMENT SEB . ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING SIGNED AND FILED BY THOMAS D. LONG, JUDGE TO SHOW WHY SANCTIONS SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE AND FAILURE TO FILE DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740. CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Zero Motorcycles, Inc. is a litigant