This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/17/2020 at 03:13:55 (UTC).

WOODCLIFF, LTD. VS SEAN GONZALES

Case Summary

On 12/03/2019 WOODCLIFF, LTD filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against SEAN GONZALES. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Santa Monica Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2432

  • Filing Date:

    12/03/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WOODCLIFF LTD.

Defendant

GONZALES SEAN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FEINBERG LAURENCE

 

Court Documents

Application for Writ of Possession - Application for Writ of Possession

1/28/2020: Application for Writ of Possession - Application for Writ of Possession

Judgment - Unlawful Detainer - Judgment - Unlawful Detainer

1/28/2020: Judgment - Unlawful Detainer - Judgment - Unlawful Detainer

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

1/24/2020: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

1/24/2020: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Proof of Service by Posting - Proof of Service by Posting

1/24/2020: Proof of Service by Posting - Proof of Service by Posting

Application for Order to Post - Application for Order to Post

12/31/2019: Application for Order to Post - Application for Order to Post

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of 12/17/2019

12/17/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of 12/17/2019

Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order)

12/17/2019: Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order)

Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6) - Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)

12/11/2019: Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6) - Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)

Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) (ALL OCCUPANTS)

12/6/2019: Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) (ALL OCCUPANTS)

Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) (SEAN GONZALES)

12/6/2019: Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) (SEAN GONZALES)

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/3/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

12/3/2019: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Summons - Summons on Complaint

12/3/2019: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Complaint - Complaint

12/3/2019: Complaint - Complaint

Property Owner/Landlord Only Hearing Notice - Property Owner/Landlord Only Hearing Notice

12/3/2019: Property Owner/Landlord Only Hearing Notice - Property Owner/Landlord Only Hearing Notice

Proof of Service - No Service - Proof of Service - No Service

2/24/2020: Proof of Service - No Service - Proof of Service - No Service

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/24/2020
  • DocketProof of Service - No Service; Filed by: WOODCLIFF, LTD. (Plaintiff); As to: SEAN GONZALES (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • DocketWrit of Possession Only (Los Angeles); Issued by: WOODCLIFF, LTD. (Plaintiff); As to: SEAN GONZALES (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • DocketUpdated -- Writ of Possession Only (Los Angeles): As To Parties changed from SEAN GONZALES (Defendant) to SEAN GONZALES (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • DocketDefault judgment by Clerk entered for Plaintiff WOODCLIFF, LTD. against Defendant SEAN GONZALES on the Complaint filed by WOODCLIFF, LTD. on 12/03/2019 for a total of $0.00.; Restitution and possession of the premises located at 3219 Overland Avenue, Apt. 8200, Los Angeles, CA 90034 is granted for plaintiff(s);; The Rental Agreement under which the property is held is hereby cancelled.; Lease Agreement under which the property is held is hereby forfeited.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • DocketApplication for Writ of Possession; Filed by: WOODCLIFF, LTD. (Plaintiff); Daily Rental Value: 88.33

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • DocketJudgment - Unlawful Detainer; Filed by: WOODCLIFF, LTD. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 02/11/2020 at 08:30 AM in Santa Monica Courthouse at Civil Clerk's Office Not Held - Vacated by Court on 01/28/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by: WOODCLIFF, LTD. (Plaintiff); As to: SEAN GONZALES (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Posting; Filed by: WOODCLIFF, LTD. (Plaintiff); As to: SEAN GONZALES (Defendant); Mailing Date: 01/05/2020; Service Cost: 67.75; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by WOODCLIFF, LTD. on 12/03/2019, entered Request for Dismissal without prejudice filed by WOODCLIFF, LTD., does Doe Defendants Only

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 12/12/2019
  • DocketUpdated -- Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6): Filed By: WOODCLIFF, LTD. (Plaintiff); Result: Granted; Result Date: 12/12/2019; As To Parties: removed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • DocketChallenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6); Filed by: WOODCLIFF, LTD. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 02/11/2020 at 08:30 AM in Santa Monica Courthouse at Civil Clerk's Office

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketNotice of Unlawful Detainer mailed 12/09/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Lisa K Sepe-Wiesenfeld in Department S Santa Monica Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: WOODCLIFF, LTD. (Plaintiff); As to: SEAN GONZALES (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: WOODCLIFF, LTD. (Plaintiff); As to: SEAN GONZALES (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: WOODCLIFF, LTD. (Plaintiff); As to: SEAN GONZALES (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • DocketProperty Owner/Landlord Only Hearing Notice; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Woodcliff Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer FEINBERG LAURENCE JAY