Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/19/2017 at 17:13:33 (UTC).

WONDRIES AUTOMOTIVE INC VS ARLENE ALVAREZ

Case Summary

On 10/12/2016 WONDRIES AUTOMOTIVE INC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against ARLENE ALVAREZ. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Alhambra Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is TONY L. RICHARDSON. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3754

  • Filing Date:

    10/12/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Alhambra Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

TONY L. RICHARDSON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WONDRIES AUTOMOTIVE INC DBA KIA OF ALHAMBRA

Po Box 1390

Alhambra, CA 91801

Defendant

ALVAREZ ARLENE

Bell, CA 90201

 

Court Documents

Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Payment Due

10/12/2016: Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Payment Due

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - (w/ Fictitious Business Name)

10/12/2016: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - (w/ Fictitious Business Name)

Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Receipt of Documents

10/12/2016: Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Receipt of Documents

Small Claims Settlement Agreement

12/21/2016: Small Claims Settlement Agreement

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - by Michelle Oliver

12/21/2016: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - by Michelle Oliver

Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

12/21/2016: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

Minute Order of 12/21/2016

12/21/2016: Minute Order of 12/21/2016

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

10/24/2016: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/21/2016
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2016
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order of 12/21/2016; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2016
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 12/21/2016 at 08:30 AM in Alhambra Courthouse at Department NE2 updated: Result Date to 12/21/2016; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2016
  • Order for dismissal Without Prejudice entered as to entire action , pursuant to 664.6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2016
  • Small Claims Settlement Agreement; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2016
  • Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) by Michelle Oliver; Filed by: WONDRIES AUTOMOTIVE INC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2016
  • Proof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: WONDRIES AUTOMOTIVE INC (Plaintiff); As to: ARLENE ALVAREZ (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 10/23/2016; Service Cost: 40.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2016
  • Invoice: Small Claims <= $1,500: Filing for $1,500 or less- CCP 116.230(b)(1); Fee: $30.00; Payment: 30.00 Receipt: 1161014E9885 (Credit Card); Balance: $0.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2016
  • Invoice: Web eFiling Transaction Fee - CRC 2.506; Fee: $10.00; Payment: 10.00 Receipt: 1161014E9885 (Credit Card); Balance: $0.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2016
  • Case assigned to Hon. Tony L. Richardson at Alhambra Courthouse in Department NE2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2016
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 12/21/2016 at 08:30 AM in Alhambra Courthouse at Department NE2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2016
  • Updated -- Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court (w/ Fictitious Business Name): Name Extension: (w/ Fictitious Business Name)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2016
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: WONDRIES AUTOMOTIVE INC (Plaintiff); As to: ARLENE ALVAREZ (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2016
  • Notice E-Filing Receipt of Documents; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2016
  • Notice of E-Filing Acceptance (Small Claims); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2016
  • Notice E-Filing Payment Due; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WONDRIES AUTOMOTIVE INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION DBA KIA OF ALHAMBRA is a litigant