This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/19/2019 at 06:00:24 (UTC).

WOJDAK, WENDELL VS INTER INSURANCE EXCHANGE AT TH

Case Summary

On 09/25/2013 WOJDAK, WENDELL filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against INTER INSURANCE EXCHANGE AT TH. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Van Nuys Courthouse East located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is RAY SANTANA. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****7381

  • Filing Date:

    09/25/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

RAY SANTANA

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

WOJDAK WENDELL

WOJDAK MARIAN

Defendants

INTER INSURANCE EXCHANGE AT THE AUTOMOBILE CLUB

PINPOINT LEAK DETECTION

MSB DISASTER RECOVERY SVC

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/08/2015
  • CASE FILE ORDERED DESTROYED PER SECTION(S) 71008 AND/OR 68152 OF THE GOVERNMENT CODE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2014
  • CAUSE CALLED AT 08:30A M, IN DEPT. NWZ , HON. RAY SANTANA PRESIDING FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING. NO APPEARANCE BY OR FOR EITHER PARTY. THE COURT ORDERS CASE DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2014
  • REQUEST FOR CONTINUANCE/POSTPONEMENT OF (WOJDAK, WENDELL) IS GRANTED. MATTER CONTINUED FOR SMALL CLAIM HEARING ON 03/20/14 AT 08:30A M. IN DEPT. NWZ , CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED AND MAILED TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2014
  • REQUEST FOR CONTINUANCE/POSTPONEMENT OF SMALL CLAIMS HEARING RECEIVED FROM (WOJDAK, WENDELL) . CASE FILE FORWARDED TO DEPT. NWZ FOR CONSIDERATION OF SECOND POSTPONEMENT REQUEST BY PLAINTIFF . RECEIPT # LAV485216005

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2013
  • PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR POSTPONEMENT (BEFORE SERVICE) FILED .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2013
  • MATTER RE-SCHEDULED FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING ON 01/29/14 AT 08:30A M, IN DEPT. NWZ .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2013
  • CLERK`S NOTICE PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM FILED AND MAILED TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL. CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2013
  • PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT FILED. RECEIPT # LAV279559005 . HEARING SET FOR 12/17/13 AT 08:30A M, IN DEPT. NWZ

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where INTER INSURANCE EXCHANGE OF THE AUTOMOBILE CLUB is a litigant