This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/13/2019 at 03:22:11 (UTC).

WLM-GP, LLC VS POLANCO, JAIME

Case Summary

On 05/30/2017 WLM-GP, LLC filed a Property - Commercial Eviction lawsuit against POLANCO, JAIME. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Pomona Courthouse South located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****1259

  • Filing Date:

    05/30/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Commercial Eviction

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Pomona Courthouse South

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WLM-GP LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Defendant

POLANCO JAIME

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ALANI DOUGLAS D. ESQ

 

Court Documents

Summons

5/30/2017: Summons

Summons

5/30/2017: Summons

Civil Case Cover Sheet

5/30/2017: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

5/30/2017: Complaint

Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction)

6/1/2017: Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction)

Property Owner/Landlord Only Hearing Notice

6/1/2017: Property Owner/Landlord Only Hearing Notice

Proof of Service (Legacy) - PROOF OF SERVICE RE: SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT FILED. SERVED AS TO (POLANCO, JAIME) . COSTS OF $ 125.00

6/12/2017: Proof of Service (Legacy) - PROOF OF SERVICE RE: SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT FILED. SERVED AS TO (POLANCO, JAIME) . COSTS OF $ 125.00

Proof of Service of Summons, Complaint and Prejudgment Claim of Right to Possession (CCP 415.46)

6/12/2017: Proof of Service of Summons, Complaint and Prejudgment Claim of Right to Possession (CCP 415.46)

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

6/23/2017: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

7/26/2017: Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order

7/28/2017: Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

7/28/2017: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Writ of (name extension) - Possession

8/9/2017: Writ of (name extension) - Possession

Writ - Return

9/5/2017: Writ - Return

Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment

11/17/2017: Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

11/17/2017: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Judgment - Unlawful Detainer

12/7/2017: Judgment - Unlawful Detainer

Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims

2/9/2018: Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/09/2018
  • Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims; Issued by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2017
  • Judgment - Unlawful Detainer; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2017
  • Default judgment entered for Plaintiff (WLM-GP, LLC) A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY against Defendant (POLANCO, JAIME) on the Complaint filed by (WLM-GP, LLC) A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY on 05/30/2017 for the principal amount of $5,268.00, damages of $1,125.00, and attorney fees of $972.64 for a total of $7,365.64.; Judgment for possession is not granted against all unnamed occupants pursuant to Code of Civil Procedure section 415.46.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2017
  • Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment; Filed by: (WLM-GP, LLC) A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2017
  • Declaration Lost Original Lease; Filed by: (WLM-GP, LLC) A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2017
  • Request for Dismissal; Filed by: (WLM-GP, LLC) A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY (Plaintiff); As to: Does: 1 - 10

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2017
  • On the Complaint filed by (WLM-GP, LLC) A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY on 05/30/2017, Request for dismissal Without Prejudice entered as to , Does 1 - 10

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2017
  • Request for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by: (WLM-GP, LLC) A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY (Plaintiff); As to: JAIME POLANCO (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2017
  • Default entered as to JAIME POLANCO; On the Complaint filed by (WLM-GP, LLC) A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY on 05/30/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2017
  • Writ - Return ( Wholly Satisfied);; Costs Credits: 0.00; Interest Credits: 0.00; Principal Credits: 0.00; Possession: Yes; Judgment Satisfaction Type: Wholly Satisfied

    Read MoreRead Less
14 More Docket Entries
  • 06/15/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT; PREJUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION FILED AS TO ANY AND ALL OCCUPANTS .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2017
  • Updated -- Proof of Service of Summons, Complaint and Prejudgment Claim of Right to Possession (CCP 415.46): Status Date changed from 06/15/2017 to 06/12/2017; As To Unnamed Occupants: true

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE RE: SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT FILED. SERVED AS TO (POLANCO, JAIME) . COSTS OF $ 125.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2017
  • NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILING MAILED TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2017
  • Property Owner/Landlord Only Hearing Notice; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2017
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED. RN POM535751023. Filing Fee: 240.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2017
  • SUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2017
  • SUMMONS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2017
  • MATTER SET FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING ON 12/01/17 AT 08:30A M, IN DEPARTMENT EAG . .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2017
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by:

    Read MoreRead Less