This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/03/2019 at 12:50:56 (UTC).

WILSHIRE INVESTMENT GROUP LLC VS REED JR, JOHN W

Case Summary

On 07/03/2014 WILSHIRE INVESTMENT GROUP LLC filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against REED JR, JOHN W. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Santa Monica Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is H. JAY FORD III. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****6665

  • Filing Date:

    07/03/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Courthouse:

    Santa Monica Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

H. JAY FORD III

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WILSHIRE INVESTMENT GROUP LLC

Defendant

REED JR JOHN W

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

KIMBALL, TIREY & ST. JOHN - CHRIS J. EVANS

Attorney at KIMBALL, TIREY & ST. JOHN

EVANS CHRIS J.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/04/2014
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED FROM LOS ANGELES COUNTY UNSATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $ 180.00 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2014
  • APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED. DAILY RENTAL VALUE OF PROPERTY, $ 123.33 PER DAY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2014
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED TO LOS ANGELES COUNTY. RECEIPT # PAID . RET BY B/S

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2014
  • CLERK'S NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT & NOTICE RE: EXHIBITS/ DEPOSITION ISSUED. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2014
  • CASE FILE RETURNED TO CIVIL DEPARTMENT FROM COURTROOM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2014
  • MINUTE ORDER - CAUSE CALLED AT 08:30A M, IN DEPT. WES , HON. H. JAY FORD III PRESIDING FOR COURT TRIAL. PLAINTIFF(S) APPEARING BY: MELISSA HERNANDEZ . DEFENDANT(S) FAILING TO APPEAR.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2014
  • STIPULATION FOR JUDGMENT FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2014
  • JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO STIPULATION ORDERED ENTERED .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2014
  • COURT ORDERS JUDGMENT ENTERED AS FOLLOWS :

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2014
  • JUDGMENT ENTERED AS A FINAL DISPOSITION ON 08/15/14 , FOR (WILSHIRE INVESTMENT GROUP LLC) , AGAINST (REED JR, JOHN W) , PAST DUE RENT $ 2500.00 , DAILY DAMAGES $ 0.00 , ATTORNEY FEES $ 0.00 , COSTS $ 0.00 . TOTAL $ 2,500.00 , AND FOR RESTITUTION OF PREMISES LOCATED AT 4932 MAYTIME LANE CULVER CITY, CA 90230 , AND THIS JUDGMENT OF POSSESSION APPLIES TO ANY AND ALL UNNAMED OCCUPANTS OF THE PREMISES PURSUANT TO C.C.P. 415.46.

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 07/10/2014
  • ORDER GRANTING REQUEST TO WAIVE COURT FEES SIGNED AND FILED AS TO (REED JR, JOHN W) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2014
  • ANSWER AND FEE WAIVER RECEIVED AS TO (REED JR, JOHN W) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2014
  • ANSWER FILED OF (REED JR, JOHN W) . RECEIPT # FEE WAIVER .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2014
  • REQUEST TO WAIVE COURT FEES FILED BY (REED JR, JOHN W) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2014
  • NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILING MAILED TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2014
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED. RN SM519607016. Filing Fee: 240.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2014
  • SUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2014
  • SUMMONS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2014
  • NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT ON FILE. CASE IS ASSIGNED TO DEPT. WES , HONORABLE H. JAY FORD III .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2014
  • MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ON 12/30/14 AT 08:30A M, IN DEPT. CLK .

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WILSHIRE INVESTMENT GROUP LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer EVANS CHRIS