This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/11/2019 at 02:01:28 (UTC).

WILSHIRE INVESTMENT GROUP LLC VS. MENARD, SHEILA

Case Summary

On 05/13/2015 WILSHIRE INVESTMENT GROUP LLC filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against MENARD, SHEILA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Santa Monica Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are H. JAY FORD III and JAMES K. HAHN. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****2469

  • Filing Date:

    05/13/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Courthouse:

    Santa Monica Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

H. JAY FORD III

Presiding Judge

JAMES K. HAHN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WILSHIRE INVESTMENT GROUP LLC

Defendants

MENARD SHEILA

ALLEN STACEY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KIMBALL, TIREY & ST. JOHN, LLP - ROY S. KIM

Attorney at KIMBALL, TIREY & ST. JOHN, LLP

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/07/2017
  • DocketCASE FILE ORDERED DESTROYED PER SECTION(S) 71008 AND/OR 68152 OF THE GOVERNMENT CODE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2017
  • DocketPURSUANT TO COURT ORDER THE CASE FILE WAS DESTROYED ON 04/07/17 . CASE SET TO BE PURGED FROM THE SYSTEM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2015
  • DocketWRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED FROM LOS ANGELES COUNTY SATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $ 145.00 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2015
  • DocketAPPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED. DAILY RENTAL VALUE OF PROPERTY, $ 116.66 PER DAY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2015
  • DocketWRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED TO LOS ANGELES COUNTY. RECEIPT # PAID . RET BY ATTY B/S

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2015
  • DocketAPPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION RECEIVED AS TO (WILSHIRE INVESTMENT GROUP LLC) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2015
  • DocketCASE FILE RETURNED TO CIVIL DEPARTMENT FROM COURTROOM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2015
  • DocketCAUSE CALLED AT 09:40A M, IN DEPT. WES , HON. JAMES K. HAHN PRESIDING FOR COURT TRIAL. PLAINTIFF(S) APPEARING MELISSA HERNANDEZ, ESQ. (X) . DEFENDANT(S) APPEARING NO APPEARANCES .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2015
  • DocketCOURT ORDERS JUDGMENT ENTERED AS FOLLOWS : FOR PLAINTIFF AND AGAINST DEFENDANTS SHEILA MENARD AND STACEY ALLEN. :

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2015
  • DocketJUDGMENT ENTERED ON 07/08/15 , FOR (WILSHIRE INVESTMENT GROUP LLC) , AGAINST (MENARD, SHEILA) , (ALLEN, STACEY) , FOR RESTITUTION OF THE PREMISES LOCATED AT: 4830 ANGELES VISTA BOULEVARD LOS ANGELES, CA 90043 , AND POSSESSION APPLIES TO ANY AND ALL UNNAMED OCCUPANTS IN THE PREMISES PURSUANT TO C.C.P. 415.46.

    Read MoreRead Less
20 More Docket Entries
  • 06/04/2015
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT FILED. SERVED AS TO (ALLEN, STACEY) . BY SUBSTITUTED SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2015
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF (ALLEN, STACEY) FILED RE: ATTORNEY FOR PLAINTIFF .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2015
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE PURSUANT TO 415.46 CCP FILED. REQUEST FILED AND DEFAULT ENTERED OF (MENARD, SHEILA) , (ALLEN, STACEY) , AND AS TO ANY AND ALL OCCUPANTS ON 06/04/15 . DECLARATION UNDER 585.5 CCP, DECLARATION PURSUANT TO 587 CCP, MEMO OF COSTS, AND DECLARATION OF NON-MILITARY STATUS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2015
  • DocketAPPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED. DAILY RENTAL VALUE OF PROPERTY, $ 116.66 PER DAY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2015
  • DocketNOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILING MAILED TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2015
  • DocketUNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED. RN SM278865026.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2015
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2015
  • DocketSUMMONS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2015
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT ON FILE. CASE IS ASSIGNED TO DEPT. WES , HONORABLE H. JAY FORD III .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2015
  • DocketMATTER SET FOR HEARING ON ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ON 11/09/15 AT 08:30A M, IN DEPT. CLK .

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WILSHIRE INVESTMENT GROUP LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer KIM, ROY S