This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/17/2014 at 05:31:01 (UTC).

WILSHIRE INVESTMENT GROUP LLC VS. JOHLES, MICHAEL A

Case Summary

On 05/05/2014 WILSHIRE INVESTMENT GROUP LLC filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against JOHLES, MICHAEL A. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Santa Monica Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****4381

  • Filing Date:

    05/05/2014

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Courthouse:

    Santa Monica Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WILSHIRE INVESTMENT GROUP LLC

Defendant

JOHLES MICHAEL A

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KIMBALL. TIREY, & ST. JOHN - JESSICA S. WEISMAN

Attorney at KIMBALL. TIREY, & ST. JOHN

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/25/2014
  • PROOF OF SERVICE FILED ANSWER .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2014
  • ANSWER FILED OF (JOHLES, MICHAEL A) . RECEIPT # FEEWAIVER. .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2014
  • NOTICE OF RULING FILED .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2014
  • NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2014
  • CASE FILE RETURNED TO CIVIL DEPARTMENT FROM COURTROOM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2014
  • CAUSE CALLED AT 01:30P M, IN DEPT. WES , HON. H. JAYFORD III PRESIDING FOR HEARING RE: (JOHLES, MICHAEL A)DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT. DEMURRER OVERRULED. DEFENDANTORDERED TO FILE & SERVE ANSWER ONLY WITHIN 5 DAYS.PLAINTIFF TO GIVE NOTICE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2014
  • OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT; POINTS ANDAUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF FILED BY (WILSHIREINVESTMENT GROUP LLC) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2014
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT; PREJUDGMENTCLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION FILED AS TO ANY AND ALLOCCUPANTS SERVED JANE DOE, MEMBER OF HOUSEHOLD ON 5/09/14.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2014
  • REQUEST FILED AND DEFAULT ENTERED AS TO ANY AND ALLOCCUPANTS PURSUANT TO 415.46 CCP; DECLARATION PURSUANT TO587 CCP FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2014
  • DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT AND P & A'S IN SUPPORT THEREOF FILEDBY (JOHLES, MICHAEL A) . MATTER NOTICED FOR HEARING ON06/19/14 AT 01:30P M IN DEPT. WES . RECEIPT # FW

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 05/16/2014
  • PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2014
  • REQUEST TO WAIVE COURT FEES FILED BY (JOHLES, MICHAEL A).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2014
  • ORDER GRANTING REQUEST TO WAIVE COURT FEES SIGNED ANDFILED AS TO (JOHLES, MICHAEL A) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2014
  • ORDER GRANTING REQUEST TO WAIVE ADDITIONAL COURT FEESSIGNED AND FILED. APPLICANT (JOHLES, MICHAEL A) ISPERMITTED TO PROCEED WITHOUT PAYMENT OF THE FOLLOWINGCOURT FEES: JURY FEES AND EXPENSES .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2014
  • NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILING MAILED TO RESPECTIVEPARTIES/COUNSEL. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2014
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED. RN SM405596033.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2014
  • SUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2014
  • SUMMONS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2014
  • NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT ON FILE. CASE IS ASSIGNED TODEPT. WES , HONORABLE H. JAY FORD III .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2014
  • MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ON 11/03/14AT 08:30A M, IN DEPT. CLK .

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WILSHIRE INVESTMENT GROUP LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer WEISMAN, JESSICA S