This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/16/2020 at 07:24:09 (UTC).

WILSHIRE INVESTMENT GROUP LLC VS DARYA DANESH

Case Summary

On 07/08/2019 WILSHIRE INVESTMENT GROUP LLC filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against DARYA DANESH. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Santa Monica Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1357

  • Filing Date:

    07/08/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Courthouse:

    Santa Monica Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WILSHIRE INVESTMENT GROUP LLC

Defendant

DANESH DARYA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SPARKS VALERIE A.

 

Court Documents

Summons - Summons on Complaint

7/8/2019: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

7/8/2019: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Property Owner/Landlord Only Hearing Notice - Property Owner/Landlord Only Hearing Notice

7/8/2019: Property Owner/Landlord Only Hearing Notice - Property Owner/Landlord Only Hearing Notice

Complaint - Complaint

7/8/2019: Complaint - Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

7/8/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) (ALL OCCUPANTS)

7/12/2019: Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) (ALL OCCUPANTS)

Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) (Darya Danesh)

7/12/2019: Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) (Darya Danesh)

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

8/2/2019: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

8/2/2019: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

8/2/2019: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Default Judgment - Unlawful Detainer - Default Judgment - Unlawful Detainer

8/5/2019: Default Judgment - Unlawful Detainer - Default Judgment - Unlawful Detainer

Application for Writ of Possession - Application for Writ of Possession

8/14/2019: Application for Writ of Possession - Application for Writ of Possession

Ex Parte Application (name extension) - Ex Parte Application for Stay of Execution

8/28/2019: Ex Parte Application (name extension) - Ex Parte Application for Stay of Execution

Minute Order - Minute Order (Ex-Parte Proceedings for Stay of Execution)

8/29/2019: Minute Order - Minute Order (Ex-Parte Proceedings for Stay of Execution)

Writ - Return - Writ - Return

9/9/2019: Writ - Return - Writ - Return

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/09/2019
  • DocketUpdated -- Writ of Execution (Los Angeles): Filed By: WILSHIRE INVESTMENT GROUP LLC (Plaintiff); Result: Returned and Filed; Result Date: 09/09/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2019
  • DocketWrit - Return ( Wholly Satisfied);; Costs Credits: 145.00; Interest Credits: 0.00; Principal Credits: 0.00; Possession: No; Judgment Satisfaction Type: Wholly Satisfied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2019
  • DocketUpdated -- Ex Parte Application for Stay of Execution: Filed By: Darya Danesh (Defendant); Result: Denied; Result Date: 08/29/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2019
  • DocketMinute Order (Ex-Parte Proceedings for Stay of Execution)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2019
  • DocketEx-parte Ex-Parte Proceedings for Stay of Execution scheduled for 08/29/2019 at 08:30 AM in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department S updated: Result Date to 08/29/2019; Result Type to Held - Motion Denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2019
  • DocketEx Parte Application for Stay of Execution; Filed by: Darya Danesh (Defendant); As to: WILSHIRE INVESTMENT GROUP LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2019
  • DocketEx-parte Ex-Parte Proceedings for Stay of Execution scheduled for 08/29/2019 at 08:30 AM in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department S

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2019
  • DocketApplication for Writ of Possession; Filed by: WILSHIRE INVESTMENT GROUP LLC (Plaintiff); Daily Rental Value: 98.16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2019
  • DocketWrit of Execution (Los Angeles); Issued by: WILSHIRE INVESTMENT GROUP LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Darya Danesh (Defendant); County: Los Angeles

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2019
  • DocketUpdated -- Writ of Execution (Los Angeles): As To Parties changed from Darya Danesh (Defendant) to Darya Danesh (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 08/02/2019
  • DocketDefault entered as to Darya Danesh; unnamed occupants pursuant to CCP 415.46; On the Complaint filed by WILSHIRE INVESTMENT GROUP LLC on 07/08/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2019
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: WILSHIRE INVESTMENT GROUP LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Darya Danesh (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 07/17/2019; Service Cost: 60.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 09/16/2019 at 08:30 AM in Santa Monica Courthouse at Civil Clerk's Office

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2019
  • DocketNotice of Unlawful Detainer mailed 07/15/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2019
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Lisa K Sepe-Wiesenfeld in Department S Santa Monica Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: WILSHIRE INVESTMENT GROUP LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Darya Danesh (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: WILSHIRE INVESTMENT GROUP LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Darya Danesh (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: WILSHIRE INVESTMENT GROUP LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Darya Danesh (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • DocketProperty Owner/Landlord Only Hearing Notice; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WILSHIRE INVESTMENT GROUP LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Sparks, Valerie