This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/04/2020 at 05:20:16 (UTC).

WILLIAM PENN VENTURES LLC VS PATRICK NICOLAS

Case Summary

On 10/18/2019 WILLIAM PENN VENTURES LLC filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against PATRICK NICOLAS. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is GAIL KILLEFER. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0241

  • Filing Date:

    10/18/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

GAIL KILLEFER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WILLIAM PENN VENTURES LLC

Defendant

NICOLAS PATRICK

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

EVANS CHRIS

 

Court Documents

Writ - Return - Writ - Return

12/30/2019: Writ - Return - Writ - Return

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

10/18/2019: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Property Owner/Landlord Only Hearing Notice - Property Owner/Landlord Only Hearing Notice

10/18/2019: Property Owner/Landlord Only Hearing Notice - Property Owner/Landlord Only Hearing Notice

Complaint - Complaint

10/18/2019: Complaint - Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

10/18/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - Summons on Complaint

10/18/2019: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) (ALL OCCUPANTS)

10/23/2019: Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) (ALL OCCUPANTS)

Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) (Patrick Nicolas)

10/23/2019: Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) (Patrick Nicolas)

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

11/15/2019: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

11/15/2019: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

11/15/2019: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Default Judgment - Unlawful Detainer - Default Judgment - Unlawful Detainer

11/21/2019: Default Judgment - Unlawful Detainer - Default Judgment - Unlawful Detainer

Application for Writ of Possession - Application for Writ of Possession

11/22/2019: Application for Writ of Possession - Application for Writ of Possession

Writ of (name extension) - Writ of Possession

11/26/2019: Writ of (name extension) - Writ of Possession

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/30/2019
  • DocketWrit - Return ( Unsatisfied);; Costs Credits: 0.00; Interest Credits: 0.00; Principal Credits: 0.00; Possession: No; Judgment Satisfaction Type: Unsatisfied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • DocketWrit of Possession; Issued by: William Penn Ventures LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Patrick Nicolas (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • DocketApplication for Writ of Possession; Filed by: William Penn Ventures LLC (Plaintiff); Daily Rental Value: 28.30

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • DocketDefault judgment by Clerk entered for Plaintiff William Penn Ventures LLC against Defendant Patrick Nicolas on the Complaint filed by William Penn Ventures LLC on 10/18/2019 for a total of $0.00.; Judgment for possession is granted against all unnamed occupants pursuant to Code of Civil Procedure section 415.46.; Restitution and possession of the premises located at 2208 W. 8th Street, #204, Los Angeles, CA 90057 is granted for plaintiff(s)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • DocketDefault Judgment - Unlawful Detainer; Filed by: William Penn Ventures LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Patrick Nicolas (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 12/27/2019 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Civil Clerk's Office Not Held - Vacated by Court on 11/21/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2019
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: William Penn Ventures LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Patrick Nicolas (Defendant); Service Date: 10/30/2019; Service Cost: 60.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2019
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by: William Penn Ventures LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Unnamed Occupants; Patrick Nicolas (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2019
  • DocketDefault entered as to Patrick Nicolas; unnamed occupants pursuant to CCP 415.46; On the Complaint filed by William Penn Ventures LLC on 10/18/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2019
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: William Penn Ventures LLC (Plaintiff); Proof of Mailing Date: 10/30/2019; Service Cost: 60.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2019
  • DocketNotice of Unlawful Detainer mailed 10/23/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 12/27/2019 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Civil Clerk's Office

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2019
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Gail Killefer in Department 97 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: William Penn Ventures LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Patrick Nicolas (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: William Penn Ventures LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Patrick Nicolas (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: William Penn Ventures LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Patrick Nicolas (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • DocketProperty Owner/Landlord Only Hearing Notice; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where William Penn Ventures, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer EVANS CHRIS