This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/07/2020 at 19:20:32 (UTC).

WILLIAM PENN VENTURES, LLC VS HUNTER B MACKEY, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 07/29/2019 WILLIAM PENN VENTURES, LLC filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against HUNTER B MACKEY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is GAIL KILLEFER. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7225

  • Filing Date:

    07/29/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

GAIL KILLEFER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WILLIAM PENN VENTURES LLC

Defendants

MACKEY HUNTER B

WILHELM KATRINA M

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FEINBERG LAURENCE

 

Court Documents

Writ - Return - Writ - Return

10/28/2019: Writ - Return - Writ - Return

Summons - Summons on Complaint

7/29/2019: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

7/29/2019: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Property Owner/Landlord Only Hearing Notice - Property Owner/Landlord Only Hearing Notice

7/29/2019: Property Owner/Landlord Only Hearing Notice - Property Owner/Landlord Only Hearing Notice

Complaint - Complaint

7/29/2019: Complaint - Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

7/29/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) (KATRINA M WILHELM)

7/31/2019: Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) (KATRINA M WILHELM)

Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) (HUNTER B MACKEY)

7/31/2019: Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) (HUNTER B MACKEY)

Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) (ALL OCCUPANTS)

7/31/2019: Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) (ALL OCCUPANTS)

Application for Order to Post - Application for Order to Post

8/9/2019: Application for Order to Post - Application for Order to Post

Proof of Service by Posting - Proof of Service by Posting

8/30/2019: Proof of Service by Posting - Proof of Service by Posting

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

8/30/2019: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

8/30/2019: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

Proof of Service by Posting - Proof of Service by Posting

8/30/2019: Proof of Service by Posting - Proof of Service by Posting

Judgment - Unlawful Detainer - Judgment - Unlawful Detainer

9/3/2019: Judgment - Unlawful Detainer - Judgment - Unlawful Detainer

Application for Writ of Possession - Application for Writ of Possession

9/4/2019: Application for Writ of Possession - Application for Writ of Possession

Writ of (name extension) - Writ of Possession

9/4/2019: Writ of (name extension) - Writ of Possession

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/28/2019
  • DocketWrit - Return ( Unsatisfied);; Costs Credits: 0.00; Interest Credits: 0.00; Principal Credits: 0.00; Possession: No; Judgment Satisfaction Type: Unsatisfied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2019
  • DocketWrit of Possession; Issued by: WILLIAM PENN VENTURES, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: HUNTER B MACKEY (Defendant); KATRINA M WILHELM (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2019
  • DocketApplication for Writ of Possession; Filed by: WILLIAM PENN VENTURES, LLC (Plaintiff); Daily Rental Value: 38.32

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2019
  • DocketDefault judgment by Clerk entered for Plaintiff WILLIAM PENN VENTURES, LLC against Defendant HUNTER B MACKEY and Defendant KATRINA M WILHELM on the Complaint filed by WILLIAM PENN VENTURES, LLC on 07/29/2019 for a total of $0.00.; Restitution and possession of the premises located at 2208 W. 8th Street, Apt. A403, Los Angeles, CA 90057 is granted for plaintiff(s)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2019
  • DocketJudgment - Unlawful Detainer; Filed by: WILLIAM PENN VENTURES, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 10/07/2019 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Civil Clerk's Office Not Held - Vacated by Court on 09/03/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2019
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: WILLIAM PENN VENTURES, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Does: 1-10

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2019
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by WILLIAM PENN VENTURES, LLC on 07/29/2019, entered Request for Dismissal without prejudice filed by WILLIAM PENN VENTURES, LLC, does 1-10

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2019
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by: WILLIAM PENN VENTURES, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: HUNTER B MACKEY (Defendant); KATRINA M WILHELM (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2019
  • DocketProof of Service by Posting; Filed by: WILLIAM PENN VENTURES, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: HUNTER B MACKEY (Defendant); Mailing Date: 08/14/2019; Service Cost: 67.10; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 08/30/2019
  • DocketDefault entered as to KATRINA M WILHELM; HUNTER B MACKEY; On the Complaint filed by WILLIAM PENN VENTURES, LLC on 07/29/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2019
  • DocketApplication for Order to Post; Filed by: WILLIAM PENN VENTURES, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: HUNTER B MACKEY (Defendant); KATRINA M WILHELM (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2019
  • DocketNotice of Unlawful Detainer mailed 07/31/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 10/07/2019 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Civil Clerk's Office

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Gail Killefer in Department 97 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: WILLIAM PENN VENTURES, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: HUNTER B MACKEY (Defendant); KATRINA M WILHELM (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2019
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: WILLIAM PENN VENTURES, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: HUNTER B MACKEY (Defendant); KATRINA M WILHELM (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: WILLIAM PENN VENTURES, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: HUNTER B MACKEY (Defendant); KATRINA M WILHELM (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2019
  • DocketProperty Owner/Landlord Only Hearing Notice; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where William Penn Ventures, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer FEINBERG LAURENCE JAY