This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/30/2020 at 10:21:35 (UTC).

WHITNEY D ACKERMAN VS OPORTUN FINANCIAL CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 08/03/2020 WHITNEY D ACKERMAN filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against OPORTUN FINANCIAL CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is SERENA R. MURILLO. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6444

  • Filing Date:

    08/03/2020

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

SERENA R. MURILLO

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ACKERMAN WHITNEY D

Defendant

OPORTUN FINANCIAL CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ACKERMAN WHITNEY D.

Defendant Attorney

JOHNSON TIMOTHY

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

12/21/2020: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

10/26/2020: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

Answer - Answer

11/2/2020: Answer - Answer

Demurrer - without Motion to Strike - Demurrer - without Motion to Strike

11/12/2020: Demurrer - without Motion to Strike - Demurrer - without Motion to Strike

Declaration (name extension) - Declaration Dec of WDA per M&C Requirement CCP 430.41

11/12/2020: Declaration (name extension) - Declaration Dec of WDA per M&C Requirement CCP 430.41

Complaint - Complaint

8/3/2020: Complaint - Complaint

Summons - Summons on Complaint

8/3/2020: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

8/3/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

8/3/2020: First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court) - Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

8/3/2020: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court) - Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

8/3/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/22/2020
  • DocketHearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike scheduled for 02/16/2021 at 10:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 12/22/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2020
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 01/31/2022 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 12/22/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 08/07/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 12/22/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2020
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by Whitney D Ackerman on 08/03/2020, entered Request for Dismissal with prejudice filed by Whitney D Ackerman as to the entire action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • DocketHearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike scheduled for 02/16/2021 at 10:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • DocketDemurrer - without Motion to Strike; Filed by: Whitney D Ackerman (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • DocketDeclaration Dec of WDA per M&C Requirement CCP 430.41; Filed by: Whitney D Ackerman (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2020
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: Oportun Financial Corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Whitney D Ackerman (Plaintiff); As to: Oportun Financial Corporation (Defendant); Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Whitney D Ackerman (Plaintiff); As to: Oportun Financial Corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Serena R. Murillo in Department 26 Spring Street Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Whitney D Ackerman (Plaintiff); As to: Oportun Financial Corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2020
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees; Filed by: Whitney D Ackerman (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2020
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Whitney D Ackerman (Plaintiff); As to: Oportun Financial Corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2020
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2020
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Signed and Filed by: Clerk; As to: Whitney D Ackerman (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2020
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 01/31/2022 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 08/07/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where OPORTUN FINANCIAL CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer JOHNSON TIMOTHY