Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/15/2020 at 04:57:22 (UTC).

WHITE ZUCKERMAN WARSAVSKY LUNA & HUNT LLP. VS SOOZAN TEHRANI

Case Summary

On 04/15/2020 WHITE ZUCKERMAN WARSAVSKY LUNA HUNT LLP filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against SOOZAN TEHRANI. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JAMES E. BLANCARTE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3346

  • Filing Date:

    04/15/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

JAMES E. BLANCARTE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WHITE ZUCKERMAN WARSAVSKY LUNA & HUNT LLP.

Defendant

TEHRANI SOOZAN AKA SOOZAN N. TEHRANI

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GOODMAN HOWARD

 

Court Documents

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

6/18/2020: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

4/15/2020: First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

Complaint - Complaint

4/15/2020: Complaint - Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

4/15/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

4/15/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Summons - Summons on Complaint

4/15/2020: Summons - Summons on Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/19/2023
  • Hearing04/19/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 25 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • Hearing10/13/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 25 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: White Zuckerman Warsavsky Luna & Hunt LLP. (Plaintiff); As to: Soozan Tehrani (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 05/07/2020; Service Cost: 47.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: White Zuckerman Warsavsky Luna & Hunt LLP. (Plaintiff); As to: Soozan Tehrani (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2020
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: White Zuckerman Warsavsky Luna & Hunt LLP. (Plaintiff); As to: Soozan Tehrani (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: White Zuckerman Warsavsky Luna & Hunt LLP. (Plaintiff); As to: Soozan Tehrani (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2020
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2020
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 10/13/2021 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 04/19/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. James E. Blancarte in Department 25 Spring Street Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: 20STLC03346    Hearing Date: April 1, 2021    Dept: 25

HEARING DATE: Thu., April 1, 2021 JUDGE /DEPT: Blancarte/25

CASE NAME: White Zuckerman Warsavsky Luna & Hunt LLP v. Tehrani

CASE NUMBER: 20STLC03346 COMP. FILED: 04-15-20

NOTICE: OK DISC. C/O: 09-13-21

DISC. MOT. C/O: 09-28-21

TRIAL DATE: 10-13-21

PROCEEDINGS: MOTION FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO A SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT

MOVING PARTY: Plaintiff White Zuckerman Warsavsky Luna & Wolf

RESP. PARTY: None

MOTION TO ENFORCE SETTLEMENT

(CCP § 664.6)

TENTATIVE RULING:

Plaintiff White Zuckerman Warsavsky Luna & Wolf’s Motion for Entry of Judgment Pursuant to a Settlement Agreement is GRANTED. Judgment to be entered against Defendant in the sum of $9,183.97, costs of $650, attorney’s fees of $2,500.00, plus interest. Proposed judgment to be filed within ten (10) days of this order.

SERVICE:

[X] Proof of Service Timely Filed (CRC, rule 3.1300) OK

[X] Correct Address (CCP §§ 1013, 1013a) OK

[X] 16/21 Court Days Lapsed (CCP §§ 12c, 1005(b)) OK

OPPOSITION: None filed as of March 29, 2021 [ ] Late [X] None

REPLY: None filed as of March 29, 2021 [ ] Late [X] None

ANALYSIS:

  1. Background

On April 15, 2020, Plaintiff White Zuckerman Warsavsky Luna & Hunt LLP (“Plaintiff”) filed an action against Soozan Tehrani aka Soozan N. Tehrani (“Defendant”) for breach of contract and common counts seeking damages of $11,020.75. (Compl., ¶ 10.) Defendant was properly substitute served with this action on May 6, 2020, but she has not yet filed an Answer.

Plaintiff filed the instant Motion for Entry of Judgment Against Defendant Pursuant to a Settlement Agreement (the “Motion”) on September 22, 2020. No opposition has been filed.

  1. Legal Standard

Under Code of Civil Procedure, section 664.6:

(a) If parties to pending litigation stipulate, in a writing signed by the parties outside of the presence of the court or orally before the court, for settlement of the case, or part thereof, the court, upon motion, may enter judgment pursuant to the terms of the settlement. If requested by the parties, the court may retain jurisdiction over the parties to enforce the settlement until performance in full of the terms of the settlement.

(b) For purposes of this section, a writing is signed by a party if it is signed by any of the following:

(1) The party.

(2) An attorney who represents the party.

(3) If the party is an insurer, an agent who is authorized in writing by the insurer to sign on the insurer's behalf.”

  1. Discussion

Plaintiff presents evidence that the parties entered into a Mutual General Release and Settlement Agreement (the “Agreement”). The Agreement was signed by Plaintiff on May 20, 2020 and by Defendant on May 22, 2020. (Mot., Goodman Decl., p. 7:10-12, Exh. 1.)

The Agreement provides that Defendant would pay Plaintiff $11,020.75 over a period of 12 months. (Id.) Monthly payments of $918.39 would commence on June 15, 2020. (Id.) The Agreement also provides that a default occurs when an installment payment is not received when due on the 15th day of the month or within a 5-day grace period. (Id.) In the event of default, the Agreement provides that Plaintiff would be entitled to recover by noticed motion, the sum of $11,020.75, together with interest at 10% per annum from November 3, 2017, court costs in the sum of $650.00, and attorney’s fees of $2,500.00, less any credit for payments made before the default. (Id.) A Motion to enter judgment is to be served on Defendant by mail at 1131 Marilyn Drive, Beverly Hills, CA 90210. (Id.)

The Court finds the Agreement to be valid and enforceable under Code of Civil Procedure section 664.6. Plaintiff provides evidence that Defendant made two payments totaling $1,836.78, but defaulted on her payments after August 15, 2020. (Mot., Goodman Decl., pp. 7:27-8:4, Exh. 2.) Defendant did not cure the default. (Mot., p. 8:12-14.)

Plaintiff requests that a judgment of $9,183.97 plus costs of $650, attorney’s fees of $2,500.00, and interest be entered against Defendant. Plaintiff’s request is GRANTED.

  1. Conclusion & Order

For the foregoing reasons, Plaintiff White Zuckerman Warsavsky Luna & Wolf LLP’s Motion for Entry of Judgment Pursuant to a Settlement Agreement is GRANTED. Judgment to be entered against Defendant in the sum of $9,183.97, costs of $650, attorney’s fees of $2,500.00, plus interest. Proposed judgment to be filed within ten (10) days of this order.

Moving party is ordered to give notice.

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WHITE ZUCKERMAN WARSAVSKY LUNA & HUNT LLP. is a litigant