This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/05/2020 at 16:38:40 (UTC).

WHEELS FINANCIAL GROUP, LLC VS MATTHEW DAVID MCGEE

Case Summary

On 02/13/2020 WHEELS FINANCIAL GROUP, LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against MATTHEW DAVID MCGEE. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Compton Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is VICTOR M. ACEVEDO. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0427

  • Filing Date:

    02/13/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Compton Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

VICTOR M. ACEVEDO

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WHEELS FINANCIAL GROUP LLC

Defendant

MCGEE MATTHEW DAVID

 

Court Documents

Notice of Continuance Due to COVID-19 State of Emergency Declarations - Notice of Continuance Due to COVID-19 State of Emergency Declarations

6/12/2020: Notice of Continuance Due to COVID-19 State of Emergency Declarations - Notice of Continuance Due to COVID-19 State of Emergency Declarations

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Notice of Continuance Due to COVID-19 State of Emergency Declarations]

6/12/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Notice of Continuance Due to COVID-19 State of Emergency Declarations]

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of 05/26/2020

5/26/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of 05/26/2020

Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order)

5/26/2020: Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 06/12/2020

6/12/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 06/12/2020

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

6/12/2020: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

4/10/2020: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 04/10/2020

4/10/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 04/10/2020

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

5/29/2020: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 05/29/2020

5/29/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 05/29/2020

Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) - Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

2/18/2020: Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) - Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

2/13/2020: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/11/2020
  • Hearing09/11/2020 at 01:30 PM in Department 7 at 200 West Compton Blvd., Compton, CA 90220; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2020
  • DocketNotice of Continuance Due to COVID-19 State of Emergency Declarations; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for [Notice of Continuance Due to COVID-19 State of Emergency Declarations]; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2020
  • DocketMinute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 06/12/2020; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2020
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 07/17/2020 at 10:00 AM in Compton Courthouse at Department 7 Not Held - Rescheduled by Court was rescheduled to 09/11/2020 08:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2020
  • DocketDue to Clerical Error, Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 09/11/2020 at 08:30 AM in Compton Courthouse at Department 7 Not Held - Clerical Error was rescheduled to 09/11/2020 01:30 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2020
  • DocketMinute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 05/29/2020; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 07/17/2020 at 10:00 AM in Compton Courthouse at Department 7

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 03/25/2020
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/29/2020 at 08:30 AM in Compton Courthouse at Department 7 Not Held - Rescheduled by Court was rescheduled to 06/12/2020 08:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2020
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 06/12/2020 at 08:30 AM in Compton Courthouse at Department 7

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2020
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/29/2020 at 08:30 AM in Compton Courthouse at Department 7

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2020
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 04/10/2020 at 08:30 AM in Compton Courthouse at Department 7 Not Held - Rescheduled by Court was rescheduled to 05/29/2020 08:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • DocketProof of Service - Personal (Small Claims); Filed by: Wheels Financial Group, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: MATTHEW DAVID MCGEE (Defendant); Service Cost: 70.00; Service Cost Waived: No; Service Date: 02/14/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Wheels Financial Group, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: MATTHEW DAVID MCGEE (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Victor M. Acevedo in Department 7 Compton Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 04/10/2020 at 08:30 AM in Compton Courthouse at Department 7

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • DocketUpdated -- Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court: As To Parties changed from MATTHEW DAVID MCGEE (Defendant) to MATTHEW DAVID MCGEE (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • DocketUpdated -- Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court: As To Parties changed from MATTHEW DAVID MCGEE (Defendant) to MATTHEW DAVID MCGEE (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.