This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/09/2020 at 08:37:51 (UTC).

WHEELS FINANCIAL GROUP LLC VS JUSTIN CHRISTOPHER MABINI

Case Summary

On 12/05/2019 WHEELS FINANCIAL GROUP LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against JUSTIN CHRISTOPHER MABINI. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, West Covina Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is ANTY MORENO PETERS. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4365

  • Filing Date:

    12/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    West Covina Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

ANTY MORENO PETERS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WHEELS FINANCIAL GROUP LLC DBA LOANMART

Defendant

MABINI JUSTIN CHRISTOPHER

 

Court Documents

Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment - Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment

3/5/2020: Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment - Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

2/4/2020: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims) - Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

2/4/2020: Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims) - Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 02/04/2020

2/4/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 02/04/2020

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

2/4/2020: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

12/16/2019: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court (w/ Fictitious Business Name)

12/5/2019: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court (w/ Fictitious Business Name)

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/05/2020
  • DocketAcknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment; Filed by: Wheels Financial Group LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Justin Christopher Mabini (Defendant); Type: Full Satisfaction

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • DocketUpdated -- Judgment entered on 03/05/2020 ; Status Date changed from 02/04/2020 to 03/05/2020 ; Status changed from Entered to Satisfied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 02/04/2020 at 08:30 AM in West Covina Courthouse at Department 3 updated: Result Date to 02/04/2020; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • DocketAuthorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims); Filed by: Wheels Financial Group LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • DocketCourt orders judgment entered for Plaintiff Wheels Financial Group LLC DBA LoanMart against Defendant Justin Christopher Mabini on the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Wheels Financial Group LLC on 12/05/2019 for the principal amount of $2,500.00 and costs of $120.00 for a total of $2,620.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • DocketMinute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 02/04/2020; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Wheels Financial Group LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Justin Christopher Mabini (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 12/07/19; Service Cost: 70.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court (w/ Fictitious Business Name); Filed by: Wheels Financial Group LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Justin Christopher Mabini (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Anthony Moreno Peters in Department 6 West Covina Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 02/06/2020 at 08:30 AM in West Covina Courthouse at Department 6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 02/06/2020 at 08:30 AM in West Covina Courthouse at Department 6 Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion was rescheduled to 02/04/2020 08:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less