This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 02/26/2019 at 06:01:02 (UTC).

WHEELS FINANCIAL GROUP LLC VS JUDITH MIRELLA LOPEZ

Case Summary

On 11/15/2016 WHEELS FINANCIAL GROUP LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against JUDITH MIRELLA LOPEZ. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Downey Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MICHAEL J. PEARCE. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6419

  • Filing Date:

    11/15/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

MICHAEL J. PEARCE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WHEELS FINANCIAL GROUP LLC DBA 1-800 LOANMART

15821 Ventura Blvd. Suite 280

Encino, CA 91436

Defendant

LOPEZ JUDITH MIRELLA

Lakewood, CA 90715

 

Court Documents

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - (w/ Fictitious Business Name)

11/15/2016: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - (w/ Fictitious Business Name)

Certificate of Mailing for - [Request for Court Order and Answer]

6/28/2017: Certificate of Mailing for - [Request for Court Order and Answer]

Notice of Rejection

6/28/2017: Notice of Rejection

Certificate of Mailing for - [Notice of Rejection]

6/28/2017: Certificate of Mailing for - [Notice of Rejection]

Request for Court Order and Answer

6/28/2017: Request for Court Order and Answer

Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

6/28/2017: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

11/29/2016: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

7/13/2017: Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

Minute Order - (Court Order)

7/13/2017: Minute Order - (Court Order)

Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order of 07/13/2017 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets

7/13/2017: Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order of 07/13/2017 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets

Certificate of Mailing for - [Order on Request for Court Order]

7/14/2017: Certificate of Mailing for - [Order on Request for Court Order]

Order on Request for Court Order

7/13/2017: Order on Request for Court Order

Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

2/1/2017: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order of 02/01/2017

2/1/2017: Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order of 02/01/2017

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

2/1/2017: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

Other - - SMALL CLAIMS AGREEMENT

2/1/2017: Other - - SMALL CLAIMS AGREEMENT

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/14/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for [Order on Request for Court Order]; Issued by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2017
  • Minute Order (Court Order)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order of 07/13/2017 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2017
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims); Entered by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2017
  • Court orders judgment entered for Plaintiff Wheels Financial Group LLC DBA 1-800 Loanmart against Defendant JUDITH MIRELLA LOPEZ on the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Wheels Financial Group LLC on 11/15/2016 for the principal amount of $2,400.00 for a total of $2,400.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2017
  • Dismissal entered on 02/01/2017, as to entire action is Vacated - .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2017
  • Order on Request for Court Order; Signed and Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for [Request for Court Order and Answer]; Issued by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2017
  • Notice of Rejection; Issued by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for [Notice of Rejection]; Issued by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 02/01/2017
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order of 02/01/2017; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 02/01/2017 at 01:30 PM in Downey Courthouse at Department SE2 updated: Result Date to 02/01/2017; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2017
  • Order for dismissal Without Prejudice entered as to entire action , pursuant to 664.6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2017
  • Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims); Filed by: Wheels Financial Group LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2016
  • Proof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Wheels Financial Group LLC (Plaintiff); As to: JUDITH MIRELLA LOPEZ (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 11/19/2016; Service Cost: 70.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2016
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court (w/ Fictitious Business Name); Filed by: Wheels Financial Group LLC (Plaintiff); As to: JUDITH MIRELLA LOPEZ (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2016
  • Invoice: Small Claims > 12 per year-Filing by person >12/year- CCP 116.230(c); Fee: $100.00; Payment: 100.00 Receipt: DW-2016-0007135 (Check); Balance: $0.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2016
  • Case assigned to Hon. Michael J. Pearce at Downey Courthouse in Department SE2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2016
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 02/01/2017 at 01:30 PM in Downey Courthouse at Department SE2

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WHEELS FINANCIAL GROUP LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY DB is a litigant