This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 02/18/2020 at 12:48:07 (UTC).

WHEELS FINANCIAL GROUP LLC VS JORGE HUMBERTO GAVELA

Case Summary

On 12/05/2019 WHEELS FINANCIAL GROUP LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against JORGE HUMBERTO GAVELA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, West Covina Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is ANTY MORENO PETERS. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4366

  • Filing Date:

    12/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    West Covina Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

ANTY MORENO PETERS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WHEELS FINANCIAL GROUP LLC DBA LOANMART

Defendant

GAVELA JORGE HUMBERTO

 

Court Documents

Small Claims Settlement Agreement - Small Claims Settlement Agreement

2/4/2020: Small Claims Settlement Agreement - Small Claims Settlement Agreement

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court (w/ Fictitious Business Name)

12/5/2019: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court (w/ Fictitious Business Name)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 02/04/2020

2/4/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 02/04/2020

Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) - Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

12/16/2019: Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) - Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

2/4/2020: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) by Dinushi Gunaratne

12/5/2019: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) by Dinushi Gunaratne

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

2/4/2020: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/04/2020
  • DocketMinute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 02/04/2020; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 02/04/2020 at 08:30 AM in West Covina Courthouse at Department 3 updated: Result Date to 02/04/2020; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • DocketAuthorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims); Filed by: Wheels Financial Group LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • DocketSmall Claims Settlement Agreement; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • DocketOn the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Wheels Financial Group LLC on 12/05/2019, entered Order for Dismissal without prejudice as to the entire action, pursuant to 664.6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • DocketProof of Service - Personal (Small Claims); Filed by: Wheels Financial Group LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Jorge Humberto Gavela (Defendant); Service Cost: 70.00; Service Cost Waived: No; Service Date: 12/07/19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court (w/ Fictitious Business Name); Filed by: Wheels Financial Group LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Jorge Humberto Gavela (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Anthony Moreno Peters in Department 6 West Covina Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 02/06/2020 at 08:30 AM in West Covina Courthouse at Department 6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • DocketAuthorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) by Dinushi Gunaratne; Filed by: Wheels Financial Group LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 02/06/2020 at 08:30 AM in West Covina Courthouse at Department 6 Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion was rescheduled to 02/04/2020 08:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less