Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/01/2021 at 04:54:16 (UTC).

WESTLAKE SERVICES, LLC VS FNR AUTOBROKER, A BUSINESS ENTITY OF UNKNOWN FORM, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 03/06/2019 WESTLAKE SERVICES, LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against FNR AUTOBROKER, A BUSINESS ENTITY OF UNKNOWN FORM. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JAMES E. BLANCARTE. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2387

  • Filing Date:

    03/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

JAMES E. BLANCARTE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WESTLAKE SERVICES LLC DBA WESTLAKE FINANCIAL SERVICES A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Defendants

REQUENA ROY

FNR AUTOBROKER A BUSINESS ENTITY OF UNKNOWN FORM

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

YADEGARI ARASH

FRIEDMAN JOSHUA P

 

Court Documents

Substitution of Attorney - Substitution of Attorney

2/21/2020: Substitution of Attorney - Substitution of Attorney

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

2/26/2020: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

2/26/2020: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

4/16/2020: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Declaration (name extension) - Declaration SUMMARY OF CASE PURSUANT TO CAL RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.1800(A)(1)

4/16/2020: Declaration (name extension) - Declaration SUMMARY OF CASE PURSUANT TO CAL RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.1800(A)(1)

Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment - Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment

4/16/2020: Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment - Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

4/16/2020: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

Default Judgment - Default Judgment

5/13/2020: Default Judgment - Default Judgment

Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims - Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims

7/6/2020: Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims - Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims

Complaint - Complaint

3/6/2019: Complaint - Complaint

Summons - Summons on Complaint

3/6/2019: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

3/6/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

3/6/2019: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

3/6/2019: First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/06/2020
  • DocketAbstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims; Issued by: Westlake Services, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2020
  • DocketDefault judgment by Court entered for Plaintiff Westlake Services, LLC DBA Westlake Financial Services, a limited liability company against Defendant FNR Autobroker, a business entity of unknown form and Defendant Roy Requena on the Complaint filed by Westlake Services, LLC on 03/06/2019 for damages of $6,464.59, attorney fees of $477.88, interest of $1,209.68, and costs of $318.80 for a total of $8,470.95.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2020
  • DocketDefault Judgment; Signed and Filed by: Westlake Services, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: FNR Autobroker, a business entity of unknown form (Defendant); Roy Requena (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2020
  • DocketUpdated -- Default Judgment: As To Parties changed from Roy Requena (Defendant), FNR Autobroker, a business entity of unknown form (Defendant) to Roy Requena (Defendant), FNR Autobroker, a business entity of unknown form (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2020
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 09/02/2020 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 05/13/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 03/09/2022 at 10:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 05/13/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2020
  • DocketUpdated -- Default Judgment: Filed By: Westlake Services, LLC (Plaintiff); Result changed from Entered to Granted; Result Date: 04/20/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2020
  • DocketDefault entered as to FNR Autobroker, a business entity of unknown form; Roy Requena; On the Complaint filed by Westlake Services, LLC on 03/06/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2020
  • DocketDeclaration SUMMARY OF CASE PURSUANT TO CAL RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.1800(A)(1); Filed by: Westlake Services, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2020
  • DocketDeclaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment; Filed by: Westlake Services, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 02/26/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Westlake Services, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: FNR Autobroker, a business entity of unknown form (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 04/08/2019; Service Cost: 31.90; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney; Filed by: Westlake Services, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2019
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 09/02/2020 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 03/09/2022 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2019
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. James E. Blancarte in Department 94 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Westlake Services, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: FNR Autobroker, a business entity of unknown form (Defendant); Roy Requena (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2019
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Westlake Services, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: FNR Autobroker, a business entity of unknown form (Defendant); Roy Requena (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Westlake Services, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: FNR Autobroker, a business entity of unknown form (Defendant); Roy Requena (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2019
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WESTLAKE SERVICES LLC DBA WESTLAKE FINANCIAL SERVICES A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer YADEGARI ARASH

Latest cases represented by Lawyer FRIEDMAN JOSHUA P