Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/04/2020 at 02:54:28 (UTC).

WESTLAKE SERVICES, LLC VS AMERICAN IMPORTS LLC, A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 03/06/2019 WESTLAKE SERVICES, LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against AMERICAN IMPORTS LLC, A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JAMES E. BLANCARTE. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2384

  • Filing Date:

    03/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

JAMES E. BLANCARTE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WESTLAKE SERVICES LLC DBA WESTLAKE FINANCIAL SERVICES A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Defendants

ROUHANA ELIE

AMERICAN IMPORTS LLC A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

YADEGARI ARASH

FRIEDMAN JOSHUA P

 

Court Documents

Substitution of Attorney - Substitution of Attorney

2/4/2020: Substitution of Attorney - Substitution of Attorney

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

8/18/2020: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

Complaint - Complaint

3/6/2019: Complaint - Complaint

Summons - Summons on Complaint

3/6/2019: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

3/6/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

3/6/2019: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

3/6/2019: First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/19/2020
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 09/02/2020 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 08/19/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 03/09/2022 at 10:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 08/19/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by Westlake Services, LLC on 03/06/2019, entered Request for Dismissal without prejudice filed by Westlake Services, LLC as to the entire action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney; Filed by: Westlake Services, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2019
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 09/02/2020 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 03/09/2022 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2019
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. James E. Blancarte in Department 94 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Westlake Services, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: American Imports LLC, a limited liability company (Defendant); Elie Rouhana (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2019
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Westlake Services, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: American Imports LLC, a limited liability company (Defendant); Elie Rouhana (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Westlake Services, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: American Imports LLC, a limited liability company (Defendant); Elie Rouhana (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2019
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WESTLAKE SERVICES LLC DBA WESTLAKE FINANCIAL SERVICES A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer YADEGARI ARASH

Latest cases represented by Lawyer FRIEDMAN JOSHUA P