This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/29/2023 at 14:07:04 (UTC).

WESTERN NATIONAL MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY VS ALL AMERICAN DESIGN, INC, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 03/22/2018 WESTERN NATIONAL MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against ALL AMERICAN DESIGN, INC,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is GEORGINA T. RIZK. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4534

  • Filing Date:

    03/22/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

GEORGINA T. RIZK

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WESTERN NATIONAL MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY

Defendants

OLSON DONNA

GARCIA CECELIA

LOFTON CHARLES E.

GOCHUICO JR. CLEMENTE

COLOSIMO ROSE

ALL AMERICAN DESIGN INC

SHAUL AVRAHAM ADAM

RUELAS PAM

RODRIGUEZ LINDA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

PAGAN JOHN MICHAEL

SOSA CARLOS EDUARDO

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

9/19/2019: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 09/19/2019

9/19/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 09/19/2019

Order (name extension) - Order Accepting Use of Copies

4/2/2019: Order (name extension) - Order Accepting Use of Copies

Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment - Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment

8/5/2019: Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment - Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment

Trial Brief - Trial Brief

2/13/2019: Trial Brief - Trial Brief

Declaration (name extension) - Declaration Application for the Court to Dix Attorney's Fees

2/13/2019: Declaration (name extension) - Declaration Application for the Court to Dix Attorney's Fees

Declaration (name extension) - Declaration Declaration in Lieu of Personal Testimoeny

2/13/2019: Declaration (name extension) - Declaration Declaration in Lieu of Personal Testimoeny

Declaration (name extension) - Declaration re Copies of the Exhibits

2/13/2019: Declaration (name extension) - Declaration re Copies of the Exhibits

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

2/13/2019: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

2/13/2019: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Default Judgment - Default Judgment

2/27/2019: Default Judgment - Default Judgment

Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Disbursement of Funds;)

2/27/2019: Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Disbursement of Funds;)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Minute Order (Hearing on Disbursement of Funds;)]

2/27/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Minute Order (Hearing on Disbursement of Funds;)]

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Hearing on Disbursement of Funds;) of 02/27/2019

2/27/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Hearing on Disbursement of Funds;) of 02/27/2019

Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims - Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims

3/15/2019: Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims - Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims

Notice (name extension) - Notice of Entry of Judgment

5/21/2019: Notice (name extension) - Notice of Entry of Judgment

Minute Order - (Hearing on Motion - Other to depost by stakeholder)

9/19/2018: Minute Order - (Hearing on Motion - Other to depost by stakeholder)

63 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/19/2019
  • DocketMinute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 09/19/2019; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by Western National Mutual Insurance Company on 03/22/2018, entered Order for Dismissal without prejudice as to the entire action

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 09/19/2019 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94 updated: Result Date to 09/19/2019; Result Type to Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 03/25/2021 at 10:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 09/19/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2019
  • DocketAcknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment; Filed by: Western National Mutual Insurance Company (Plaintiff); As to: All American Design, Inc (Defendant); Avraham Adam Shaul (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment; Filed by: Western National Mutual Insurance Company (Plaintiff); As to: All American Design, Inc (Defendant); Avraham Adam Shaul (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • DocketUpdated -- Order Accepting Use of Copies: Status Date changed from 02/13/2019 to 04/02/2019; As To Parties: removed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2019
  • DocketAbstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims; Issued by: Western National Mutual Insurance Company (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for [Minute Order (Hearing on Disbursement of Funds;)]; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
62 More Docket Entries
  • 05/02/2018
  • DocketAffidavit of Reasonable diligence; Filed by: Western National Mutual Insurance Company (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/02/2018
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Western National Mutual Insurance Company (Plaintiff); As to: Rose Colosimo (Defendant); Service Date: 03/31/18; Service Cost: 65.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/02/2018
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Western National Mutual Insurance Company (Plaintiff); As to: Cecelia Garcia (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 04/05/18; Service Cost: 65.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Western National Mutual Insurance Company (Plaintiff); As to: All American Design, Inc (Defendant); Avraham Adam Shaul (Defendant); Rose Colosimo (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2018
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Western National Mutual Insurance Company (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2018
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2018
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Georgina T. Rizk in Department 77 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2018
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 09/19/2019 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 77

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2018
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 03/25/2021 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 77

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less