This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/15/2016 at 05:24:37 (UTC).

WESTERN MANAGEMENT CONTROL INC VS BADBOY X2 ENTERTAINMENT INC

Case Summary

On 10/22/2013 WESTERN MANAGEMENT CONTROL INC filed a Property - Commercial Eviction lawsuit against BADBOY X2 ENTERTAINMENT INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****3091

  • Filing Date:

    10/22/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Commercial Eviction

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WESTERN MANAGEMENT CONTROL INC

Defendants

BADBOY X2 ENTERTAINMENT INC

CORDOVA OSCAR JAVIER

SURIANO JAIME

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CONSTANT, MARK

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/07/2013
  • DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2013
  • JUDGMENT AS TO UNNAMED TENANTS - CCP 415.46

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2013
  • HEARING DELETED - OFF CALENDAR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2013
  • PROOF OF SERVICE TO COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2013
  • REQUEST FOR DEFAULT FILED AND ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2013
  • DEFAULT AS TO UNNAMED TENANTS - CCP 415.46/PROOF OF SERVICE FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2013
  • SUBMISSION FOR DEFAULT AND JUDGMENT PENDING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2013
  • NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER MAILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2013
  • COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2013
  • SUMMONS FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2013
  • OSC SET 04/21/14, 08:30 AM, DEPT. 94 PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER * * DELETED

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WESTERN MANAGEMENT CONTROL INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CONSTANT MARK ROBERT