This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/21/2021 at 05:49:44 (UTC).

WESTERN DEVELOPERS, INC. VS DANIEL OROZCO-DIAZ

Case Summary

On 02/27/2020 WESTERN DEVELOPERS, INC filed a Property - Commercial Eviction lawsuit against DANIEL OROZCO-DIAZ. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is GAIL KILLEFER. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2180

  • Filing Date:

    02/27/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Commercial Eviction

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

GAIL KILLEFER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WESTERN DEVELOPERS INC.

Defendants

AMAYA CORINA MONIQUE

OROZCO-DIAZ DANIEL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

PARTIYELI JACOB O.

GAUMER CHRISTIE

Defendant Attorney

YACKO TOM NICHOLAS

 

Court Documents

Ex Parte Application (name extension) - Ex Parte Worksheet

4/7/2021: Ex Parte Application (name extension) - Ex Parte Worksheet

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Hearing on Ex Parte Application Order Entering Judgment for D...) of 04/09/2021

4/9/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Hearing on Ex Parte Application Order Entering Judgment for D...) of 04/09/2021

Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Ex Parte Application Order Entering Judgment for D...)

4/9/2021: Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Ex Parte Application Order Entering Judgment for D...)

Declaration in Support of Ex Parte Application - Declaration in Support of Ex Parte Application

4/8/2021: Declaration in Support of Ex Parte Application - Declaration in Support of Ex Parte Application

Notice of Ruling - Notice of Ruling

4/12/2021: Notice of Ruling - Notice of Ruling

Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment - Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

3/16/2021: Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment - Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

Declaration (name extension) - Declaration of Christie Gaumer re OSC re Proof of Service and Status

3/10/2021: Declaration (name extension) - Declaration of Christie Gaumer re OSC re Proof of Service and Status

Declaration re: Due Diligence - Declaration re: Due Diligence

9/25/2020: Declaration re: Due Diligence - Declaration re: Due Diligence

Amended Complaint - Amended Complaint (1st)

8/4/2020: Amended Complaint - Amended Complaint (1st)

Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike)

9/16/2020: Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike)

Ex Parte Application (name extension) - Ex Parte Worksheet

8/10/2020: Ex Parte Application (name extension) - Ex Parte Worksheet

Demurrer - without Motion to Strike - Demurrer - without Motion to Strike

8/17/2020: Demurrer - without Motion to Strike - Demurrer - without Motion to Strike

Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order)

8/19/2020: Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order)

Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order)

6/19/2020: Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order)

Complaint - Complaint

2/27/2020: Complaint - Complaint

Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) (DANIEL OROZCO-DIAZ)

3/4/2020: Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) (DANIEL OROZCO-DIAZ)

Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10) - Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)

4/2/2020: Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10) - Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Minute Order (Court Order)]

4/23/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Minute Order (Court Order)]

36 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by: Corina Monique Amaya (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketUpdated -- Ex Parte Application Order Entering Judgment for Dismissal: Filed By: Corina Monique Amaya (Defendant); Result: Granted; Result Date: 04/09/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketOn the Amended Complaint (1st) filed by WESTERN DEVELOPERS, INC. on 08/04/2020, entered Order for Dismissal with prejudice as to the entire action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketEx Parte Worksheet; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketMinute Order (Hearing on Ex Parte Application Order Entering Judgment for D...)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Hearing on Ex Parte Application Order Entering Judgment for D...) of 04/09/2021; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketNotice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketHearing on Ex Parte Application Order Entering Judgment for Dismissal scheduled for 04/09/2021 at 01:30 PM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 97 updated: Result Date to 04/09/2021; Result Type to Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • DocketEx Parte Application Order Entering Judgment for Dismissal; Filed by: Corina Monique Amaya (Defendant); As to: WESTERN DEVELOPERS, INC. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • DocketDeclaration in Support of Ex Parte Application; Filed by: Corina Monique Amaya (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
58 More Docket Entries
  • 04/02/2020
  • DocketDemurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10); Filed by: Corina Monique Amaya (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2020
  • DocketPrejudgment Claim of Right to Possession; Filed by: Corina Monique Amaya (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • DocketNotice of Unlawful Detainer mailed 03/04/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 05/07/2020 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Civil Clerk's Office

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Gail Killefer in Department 97 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • DocketProperty Owner/Landlord Only Hearing Notice; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: WESTERN DEVELOPERS, INC. (Plaintiff); As to: DANIEL OROZCO-DIAZ (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: WESTERN DEVELOPERS, INC. (Plaintiff); As to: DANIEL OROZCO-DIAZ (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: WESTERN DEVELOPERS, INC. (Plaintiff); As to: DANIEL OROZCO-DIAZ (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WESTERN DEVELOPERS INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer PARTIYELI JACOB O