This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/23/2019 at 12:34:17 (UTC).

WEST LOS ANGELES ADJUDICATION VS SUVANSINGH, TACHPONG

Case Summary

On 02/27/2013 WEST LOS ANGELES ADJUDICATION filed an Infraction - Parking lawsuit against SUVANSINGH, TACHPONG. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****1663

  • Filing Date:

    02/27/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Infraction - Parking

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WEST LOS ANGELES ADJUDICATION

Defendant

SUVANSINGH TACHPONG

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WEST LOS ANGELES ADJUDICATION

Defendant Attorney

SUVANSINGH, TACHPONG

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/17/2015
  • DocketCASE DESTROYED PURSUANT TO GC 68152 D(1)/GC 68152 D(2)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2013
  • DocketNOTICE OF DECISION - PARKING APPEAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2013
  • DocketPRE-TRIAL MINUTES-CONTD TO 05/09/13 AT 01:30 P M IN DEPT. 77

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2013
  • DocketIN DEPT. 77 AT 8:30 A.M. FUTURE HEARING DATE(S) REMAIN THE SAME

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2013
  • DocketEFFECTIVE 04/08/13 CASE REASSIGNED TO THE LOS ANGELES COURTHOUSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2013
  • DocketCIVIL DEPOSIT OF 25.00 FOR PARKING APPEAL FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2013
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF NOTICE OF APPEAL - PARKING FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2013
  • DocketHEARING DATE SET FOR 04/25/13, 10:00 AM, DEPT 106

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2013
  • DocketORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER FOR TACHPONG SUVANSINGH IS DENIED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2013
  • DocketCLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE MAILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2013
  • Docket**FEES DUE ON DENIED FEE WAIVER BY 3/15/13 FOR TACHPONG SUVANSINGH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2013
  • DocketPARKING APPEAL FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2013
  • DocketAPPEAL FROM ADMINISTRATIVE DECISION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2013
  • DocketRESPONSE FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2013
  • DocketFEE WAIVER FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2013
  • DocketA/C - FEE WAIVER

    Read MoreRead Less