This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/04/2019 at 01:14:51 (UTC).

WEST COVINA MOTOR GROUP LLC VS KELLY RAYGOZA, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 08/27/2018 WEST COVINA MOTOR GROUP LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against KELLY RAYGOZA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, West Covina Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is SUSAN J. TOWNSEND. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3186

  • Filing Date:

    08/27/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

SUSAN J. TOWNSEND

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WEST COVINA MOTOR GROUP LLC DBA WEST COVINA NISSAN

Defendants

RAYGOZA KELLY

LAMAR WLADIMMIR

 

Court Documents

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

8/27/2018: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 11/06/2018

11/6/2018: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 11/06/2018

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

11/6/2018: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) - Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

10/23/2018: Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) - Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

10/23/2018: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Court Order) of 02/27/2019

2/27/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Court Order) of 02/27/2019

Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims) - Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

2/27/2019: Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims) - Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

Order on Request for Court Order - Order on Request for Court Order

2/27/2019: Order on Request for Court Order - Order on Request for Court Order

Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order)

2/27/2019: Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order)

Request for Court Order and Answer - Request for Court Order and Answer

2/14/2019: Request for Court Order and Answer - Request for Court Order and Answer

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Request for Court Order and Answer]

2/14/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Request for Court Order and Answer]

Small Claims Settlement Agreement - Small Claims Settlement Agreement

11/6/2018: Small Claims Settlement Agreement - Small Claims Settlement Agreement

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

11/6/2018: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/27/2019
  • Updated -- Request for Court Order and Answer: Filed By: West Covina Motor Group LLC (Plaintiff); Result: Granted; Result Date: 02/27/2019; As To Parties: removed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2019
  • Court orders judgment entered for Plaintiff West Covina Motor Group LLC DBA West Covina Nissan against Defendant Kelly Raygoza on the Plaintiff's Claim filed by West Covina Motor Group LLC on 08/27/2018 for the principal amount of $260.00 for a total of $260.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2019
  • Order on Request for Court Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2019
  • Minute Order (Court Order)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2019
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Court Order) of 02/27/2019; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2019
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2019
  • ERROR with ROA message definition 129 with DismissalParty:1544597 resulted in empty message

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • Request for Court Order and Answer; Filed by: West Covina Motor Group LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • Updated -- Request for Court Order and Answer: As To Parties: removed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • Certificate of Mailing for [Request for Court Order and Answer]; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 11/06/2018
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 11/06/2018 at 08:30 AM in West Covina Courthouse at Department 6 updated: Result Date to 11/06/2018; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2018
  • Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims); Filed by: West Covina Motor Group LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2018
  • Small Claims Settlement Agreement; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2018
  • On the Plaintiff's Claim filed by West Covina Motor Group LLC on 08/27/2018, entered Order for Dismissal without prejudice as to Wladimmir Lamar

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2018
  • On the Plaintiff's Claim filed by West Covina Motor Group LLC on 08/27/2018, entered Order for Dismissal without prejudice as to the entire action, pursuant to the Settlement Agreement, 664.6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2018
  • Proof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: West Covina Motor Group LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Kelly Raygoza (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 10/10/18; Service Cost: 49.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2018
  • Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims); Filed by: West Covina Motor Group LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Wladimmir Lamar (Defendant); Service Cost: 49.00; Service Cost Waived: No; Service Date: 10/08/18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2018
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: West Covina Motor Group LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Kelly Raygoza (Defendant); Wladimmir Lamar (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2018
  • Case assigned to Hon. Susan J. Townsend in Department 6 West Covina Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2018
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 11/06/2018 at 08:30 AM in West Covina Courthouse at Department 6

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WEST COVINA MOTOR GROUP LLC DBA WEST COVINA NISSAN is a litigant