This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/20/2019 at 11:13:43 (UTC).

WESCO INSURANCE COMPANY, VS STELOR ENTERPRISES, INC.,

Case Summary

On 08/15/2017 WESCO INSURANCE COMPANY filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against STELOR ENTERPRISES, INC . This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is ELAINE LU. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2560

  • Filing Date:

    08/15/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

ELAINE LU

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WESCO INSURANCE COMPANY

Defendants

STELOR ENTERPRISES INC.

FIRST & ICE TRANSPORT LLC

CHAMBERLAIN BACKHOE SERVICE DBA AMERICAN BACKHOE A CORPORATION

GANAHL LUMBER COMPANY

CERRITOS FITNESS & HEALTH LLC

FIRE & ICE TRANSPORT LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SOSA CARLOS EDUARDO

Attorney at Hausman & Sosa LLP

20750 Ventura Blvd Ste 105

Woodland Hills, CA 91364

Defendant Attorney

SGRO WILLIAM RANDALL

Attorney at Fruchter & Sgro, APC

1623 Cravens Ave

Torrance, CA 90501

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion - Other CLAIM BOND FUNDS)

1/29/2019: Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion - Other CLAIM BOND FUNDS)

Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order)

2/22/2019: Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order)

Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing - Other re: on disbursement of funds)

3/14/2019: Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing - Other re: on disbursement of funds)

Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing - Other re: on disbursement of funds)

2/5/2019: Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing - Other re: on disbursement of funds)

Minute Order - (Hearing - Other re: on disbursement of funds)

10/17/2018: Minute Order - (Hearing - Other re: on disbursement of funds)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Hearing - Other re: on disbursement of funds) of 12/05/2018

12/5/2018: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Hearing - Other re: on disbursement of funds) of 12/05/2018

Stipulation and Order (name extension) - Stipulation and Order TO VACATE DEFAULT AND ANY ASSOCIATED DEFAULT JUDGMENT

12/5/2018: Stipulation and Order (name extension) - Stipulation and Order TO VACATE DEFAULT AND ANY ASSOCIATED DEFAULT JUDGMENT

Request for Dismissal

3/23/2018: Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal

10/5/2017: Request for Dismissal

Other - (name extension) - civil deposit in trust

3/5/2018: Other - (name extension) - civil deposit in trust

Request for Dismissal

1/30/2018: Request for Dismissal

Minute Order - (Hearing - Other re: on disbursement of funds)

4/19/2018: Minute Order - (Hearing - Other re: on disbursement of funds)

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

11/2/2017: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Proof of Personal Service

9/22/2017: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

9/22/2017: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

9/22/2017: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

9/13/2017: Proof of Personal Service

Summons - on Complaint

8/15/2017: Summons - on Complaint

26 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/14/2019
  • DocketHearing - Other re: on disbursement of funds scheduled for 06/06/2019 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • DocketMinute Order (Hearing - Other re: on disbursement of funds)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Hearing - Other re: on disbursement of funds) of 03/14/2019; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Hearing - Other re: on disbursement of funds scheduled for 03/14/2019 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94 Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion was rescheduled to 06/06/2019 08:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2019
  • DocketHearing - Other re: on disbursement of funds scheduled for 03/14/2019 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2019
  • DocketMinute Order (Court Order)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Court Order) of 02/22/2019; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2019
  • DocketThere being no judge available this date, Hearing - Other re: on disbursement of funds scheduled for 03/05/2019 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94 Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion was rescheduled to 03/14/2019 08:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2019
  • DocketHearing - Other re: on disbursement of funds scheduled for 03/05/2019 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2019
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Hearing - Other re: on disbursement of funds scheduled for 02/05/2019 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94 Held - Continued was rescheduled to 03/05/2019 08:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
49 More Docket Entries
  • 09/22/2017
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Wesco Insurance Company, (Plaintiff); As to: Chamberlain Backhoe Service (Defendant); Service Date: 09/02/2017; Service Cost: 65.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2017
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Wesco Insurance Company, (Plaintiff); As to: Ganahl Lumber Company (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 09/05/2017; Service Cost: 65.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2017
  • DocketProof of Service Summons and Complaint; Filed by: Wesco Insurance Company, (Plaintiff); As to: FIrst & Ice Transport, LLC (Defendant); Service Date: 08/30/2017; Service Cost: 30.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2017
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Wesco Insurance Company, (Plaintiff); As to: Stelor Enterprises, Inc., (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2017
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Wesco Insurance Company, (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2017
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2017
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2017
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Elaine Lu in Department 77 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2017
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 02/13/2019 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 77

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2017
  • DocketOSC - Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 08/18/2020 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 77

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: 17STLC02560    Hearing Date: March 11, 2020    Dept: 26

Wesco v. Stelor, et al.

HEARING ON DISBURSEMENT OF FUNDS

(CCP § 386)

TENTATIVE RULING:

Hearing on Disbursement of Funds is PLACED OFF CALENDAR. PER CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE SECTION 128 AND CAL. GOVERNMENT CODE SECTION 68084.1 THE COURT SETS AN ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: ESCHEATING OF FUNDS FOR FEBRUARY 22, 2021 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 26 IN THE SPRING STREET COURTHOUSE.

ANALYSIS:

On August 15, 2017, Plaintiff Wesco Insurance Company filed a Complaint in Interpleader against Defendants Stelor Enterprises, Inc. (“Stelor”), Cerritos Fitness & Health, LLC (“Cerritos”), Fire & Ice Transport, LLC (“F&IT”), Chamberlain Backhoe Service dba American Backhoe (“CBS”), and Ganahl Lumber Company (“GLC”). The status of the parties is as follows:

On February 8, 2018, the Court granted Plaintiff’s motion to deposit by stakeholder and for discharge of stakeholder. On the same date, the Court set a hearing on disbursement of funds for April 19, 2018 and ordered Plaintiff to give notice to all parties. On February 13, 2018, Plaintiff filed notice of the Court’s ruling and proof of service of the same. On February 20, 2018, Plaintiff deposited $5,500.00 in funds with the Court.

There are now only two parties remaining in this action: Claimants Cerritos and F&IT. The hearing on disbursement of funds was initially scheduled for April 19, 2018. Although no parties filed a claim in advance of that hearing, F&IT appeared through its owner, Keith Kurata (“Kurata”), so the Court continued the matter to October 17, 2018. On October 17, 2018, F&IT again appeared through Kurata and the court continued the matter to December 5, 2018. On December 5, 2018, the court continued the matter to February 5, 2019 to allow F&IT to file a claim through Kurata. F&IT, through Kurata, filed its Answer on December 14, 2018, and its claim on December 18, 2018.

Prior to the hearing on February 5, 2019, the matter was continued to March 14, 2019. At the hearing on March 14, 2019, the court struck the Answer and Claim purportedly filed on behalf of F&IT through Kurata and continued the hearing to allow F&IT an opportunity to file a proper Answer and Claim through an attorney. The new claim was to be filed and served at least 16 court days prior to the June 6, 2019 hearing date.

At the June 6, 2019 hearing, F&IT appeared through an attorney and the Court continued the hearing to August 13, 2019. Due to clerical error, the hearing on August 13, 2019 was continued to March 11, 2020.

To date, despite numerous continuances of the hearing on disbursement of funds, no valid claim has been filed by either Cerritos or F&IT. Therefore, the hearing on disbursement of funds is PLACED OFF CALENDAR. PER CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE SECTION 128 AND CAL. GOVERNMENT CODE SECTION 68084.1 THE COURT SETS AN ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: ESCHEATING OF FUNDS FOR FEBRUARY 22, 2021 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 26 IN THE SPRING STREET COURTHOUSE.

Court clerk to give notice.