This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/05/2020 at 17:32:49 (UTC).

WESCO INSURANCE COMPANY, A CORPORATION VS KYLE KAPLAN, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 12/04/2018 WESCO INSURANCE COMPANY, A CORPORATION filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against KYLE KAPLAN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is WENDY CHANG. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4796

  • Filing Date:

    12/04/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

WENDY CHANG

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WESCO INSURANCE COMPANY A CORPORATION

Defendants

KAPLAN KYLE

AMERICAN INTERNATIONAL ALLIANCE INC. DBA STAR CONSTRUCTION 1 A CORPORATION

UMRDINOV SARDOR

O NEAL STEPHANIE

WEITMAN BRIAN

WEITMAN AMY

PANELLA LAURA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SOSA CARLOS

Defendant Attorneys

MELKONIAN GEOFFREY

LISNOW ROBERT

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing - Other Re: Disbursement of Funds)

3/4/2020: Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing - Other Re: Disbursement of Funds)

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order - Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

11/25/2019: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order - Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Notice (name extension) - Notice of Continuance of Disbursement Hearing

12/5/2019: Notice (name extension) - Notice of Continuance of Disbursement Hearing

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

9/30/2019: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

Notice of Ruling - Notice of Ruling

9/10/2019: Notice of Ruling - Notice of Ruling

Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion - Other Deposit by Stakeholder)

9/4/2019: Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion - Other Deposit by Stakeholder)

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

8/8/2019: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

7/23/2019: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

4/23/2019: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Answer - Answer

4/2/2019: Answer - Answer

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

3/15/2019: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Answer - Answer

3/19/2019: Answer - Answer

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

3/8/2019: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name) - Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

2/8/2019: Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name) - Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

2/28/2019: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

2/28/2019: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

12/4/2018: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

12/4/2018: First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

24 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/07/2021
  • Hearing12/07/2021 at 10:30 AM in Department 26 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • Hearing02/03/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 26 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2020
  • DocketNotice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2020
  • DocketReset - Court Unavailable, Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 06/02/2020 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court was rescheduled to 02/03/2021 08:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • DocketMinute Order (Hearing - Other Re: Disbursement of Funds)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Hearing - Other Re: Disbursement of Funds) of 03/04/2020; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • DocketHearing - Other Re: Disbursement of Funds scheduled for 03/04/2020 at 10:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 updated: Result Date to 03/04/2020; Result Type to Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • DocketDeclaration CLAIM FOR AWARD OF INTERPLEADED FUNDS; DECLARATION OF STEPHANIE O?NEAL; Filed by: STEPHANIE O NEAL (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • DocketNotice of Continuance of Disbursement Hearing; Filed by: Wesco Insurance Company, a corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • DocketNotice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
32 More Docket Entries
  • 02/11/2019
  • DocketAmendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name); Filed by: Wesco Insurance Company, a corporation (Plaintiff); As to: Brian Weitman (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2019
  • DocketAmendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name); Filed by: Wesco Insurance Company, a corporation (Plaintiff); As to: Amy Weitman (Defendant); Brian Weitman (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2018
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 06/02/2020 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2018
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 12/07/2021 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2018
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Wendy Chang in Department 94 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Wesco Insurance Company, a corporation (Plaintiff); As to: KYLE KAPLAN (Defendant); STEPHANIE O NEAL (Defendant); SARDOR UMRDINOV (Defendant) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2018
  • DocketSummons (Joint Debtor); Issued and Filed by: Wesco Insurance Company, a corporation (Plaintiff); As to: KYLE KAPLAN (Defendant); STEPHANIE O NEAL (Defendant); SARDOR UMRDINOV (Defendant) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2018
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Wesco Insurance Company, a corporation (Plaintiff); As to: KYLE KAPLAN (Defendant); STEPHANIE O NEAL (Defendant); SARDOR UMRDINOV (Defendant) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2018
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: 18STLC14796    Hearing Date: March 04, 2020    Dept: 26

Wesco Ins. Co. v. Kaplan, et al.

HEARING ON DISBURSEMENT OF FUNDS

(CCP §§ 386, 386.5)

TENTATIVE RULING:

Hearing on disbursement of funds is PLACED OFF CALENDAR. THE MATTER REMAINS SET FOR TRIAL ON JUNE 2, 2020 AT 8:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 26 IN THE SPRING STREET COURTHOUSE.

ANALYSIS:

On December 4, 2018, Plaintiff Wesco Insurance Company (“Plaintiff”) filed this action for interpleader and indemnity against Defendants American International Alliance, Inc. dba Star Construction 1 (“Star Construction”), Sardor Umrdibov (“Umrdibov”), Stephanie O’Neal (“O’Neal”), and Kyle Kaplan (“Kaplan”). Plaintiff then filed two Amendments to the Complaint naming Doe 21 and 22 as Brian Weitman and Amy Weitman (collectively, the “Weitmans”), respectively.

This action arose from a dispute over Bond No. 04WB082074 (the “Bond”) in the penal sum of $15,000 for homeowner claimants or $7,500 for non-homeowner claimants. (Compl. ¶¶ 6, 24.) Pursuant to the Application and Indemnity Agreement, Star Construction and Umrdibov agreed to indemnify Plaintiff in exchange for the issuance of the Bond. (Id. ¶ 5.) The Complaint alleges that O’Neal, Kaplan, and the Weitmans (collectively, “Claimants”) have conflicting claims for the bond funds. (Id. ¶ 20.)

On May 24, 2019, Plaintiff filed a Motion to Deposit by Stakeholder, for Discharge of Stakeholder, and for Attorney’s Fees (the “Motion”). On September 4, 2019, the Court granted Plaintiff’s motion to deposit by stakeholder. (See Order, filed 9/4/19.) The court ordered Plaintiff discharged from all liability to defendants in this action and to any other claim with respect to the subject bond. Plaintiff was ordered to deposit the amount of the subject bond ($15,000) less costs awarded to Plaintiff ($2,000) with the clerk of this court. Plaintiff gave notice of the order and disbursement hearing on September 10, 2019. The funds of $13,000.00 were deposited with the Court on October 1, 2019. The Court also the hearing on disbursement of the funds for December 11, 2019. Due to the Court’s unavailability, however, the hearing was continued to March 4, 2020.

Defendants O’Neal and the Weitmans filed written claims to the interpleader funds on October 4, 2019. The Court finds that Defendants O’Neal and the Weitmans, having filed Answers and claims to the interpleader funds, their conflicting claims are issues triable by the court. Code of Civil Procedure section 386, subdivision (e) states in relevant part:

Except in cases where by the law a right to a jury trial is now given, conflicting claims to funds or property or the value thereof so deposited or delivered shall be deemed issues triable by the court, and such issues may be first tried. In the event the amount deposited shall be less than the amount claimed to be due by one or more of the conflicting claimants thereto, or in the event the property or the value thereof delivered is less than all of the property or the value thereof claimed by one or more of such conflicting claimants, any issues of fact involved in determining whether there is a deficiency in such deposit or delivery shall be tried by the court or a jury as provided in Title 8 (commencing with Section 577) of Part 2 of this code.

(Code Civ. Proc., § 386, subd. (e).) Here, Defendants O’Neal and the Weitmans each claim the full amount of the deposited funds. The hearing on disbursement of funds is therefore PLACED OFF CALENDAR. THE MATTER REMAINS SET FOR TRIAL ON JUNE 2, 2020 AT 8:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 26 IN THE SPRING STREET COURTHOUSE.

Court clerk to give notice.