This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/15/2022 at 00:00:28 (UTC).

WELLS FARGO FINANCIAL NATIONAL VS GARCIA, ERIC

Case Summary

On 06/13/2013 WELLS FARGO FINANCIAL NATIONAL filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against GARCIA, ERIC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Norwalk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is HOWARD L. HALM. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0297

  • Filing Date:

    06/13/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

HOWARD L. HALM

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WELLS FARGO FINANCIAL NATIONAL BANK

Defendant

GARCIA ERIC AKA ERIC GARCIA AN INDIVIDUAL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MIGUEL CHRISTOPHER A.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/06/2017
  • DocketACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT IN THE AMOUNT OF $ 937.65 FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2017
  • DocketNOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS FOR ATTORNEY FOR PLAINTIFF (WELLS FARGO FINANCIAL NATIONAL BANK) FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2017
  • DocketNOTICE OF CHANGE OF PHONE NUMBER FOR ATTORNEY FOR PLAINTIFF (WELLS FARGO FINANCIAL NATIONAL BANK) FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/24/2014
  • DocketJUDGMENT DEFAULT BY CLERK ENTERED AS FOLLOWS:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/24/2014
  • DocketJUDGMENT ENTERED AS A FINAL DISPOSITION ON 04/24/14 . FOR (WELLS FARGO FINANCIAL NATIONAL BANK) . AGAINST (GARCIA, ERIC) AKA (ERIC, GARCIA) AN INDIVIDUAL . PRINCIPAL $ 9077.58 . ATTORNEY FEES $ 634.65 . INTEREST $ .00 . COSTS $ 303.00 . TOTAL $ 10,015.23 . /SG

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/17/2014
  • DocketWAIVER OF SECURITY INTEREST FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/17/2014
  • DocketTERMS AND CONDITIONS FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/17/2014
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT RECEIVED AS TO (GARCIA, ERIC) AKA (ERIC, GARCIA) AN INDIVIDUAL .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/17/2014
  • DocketREQUEST FILED AND DEFAULT ENTERED OF ERIC GARCIA AKA GARCIA ERIC . DECLARATION UNDER 585.5 CCP, DECLARATION PURSUANT TO 587 CCP, MEMO OF COSTS, AND DECLARATION OF NON-MILITARY STATUS FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/17/2014
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S 1-100 BRIEF FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 12/26/2013
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE RE: SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT FILED. SERVED AS TO (GARCIA, ERIC) AKA (ERIC, GARCIA) AN INDIVIDUAL SUB-SERVED ON 12/21/13 BY LEAVING WITH JOHN DOE, OCCUPANT. . COSTS OF $ 39.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/04/2013
  • DocketORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING SIGNED AND FILED BY HOWARD L. HALM, JUDGE TO SHOW WHY SANCTIONS SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO FILE REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740(F). MATTER CONTINUED FOR HEARING ON 05/31/16 AT 08:30A M., IN DEPT. SEY . CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED, GIVEN TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/ COUNSEL.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/04/2013
  • DocketORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING SIGNED AND FILED BY HOWARD L. HALM, JUDGE TO SHOW WHY SANCTIONS SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO FILE REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740(F). MATTER CONTINUED FOR HEARING ON 05/31/16 AT 08:30A M., IN DEPT. SEY . CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED, GIVEN TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/ COUNSEL.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/19/2013
  • Docket1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED. AND FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/28/2013
  • DocketORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING/CASE MANAGEMENT REVIEW SIGNED AND FILED BY HOWARD L. HALM, JUDGE TO SHOW WHY SANCTIONS SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740(E). MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON 06/09/14 AT 08:30A M., IN DEPT. SEY . CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/28/2013
  • DocketORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING/CASE MANAGEMENT REVIEW SIGNED AND FILED BY HOWARD L. HALM, JUDGE TO SHOW WHY SANCTIONS SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740(E). MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON 06/09/14 AT 08:30A M., IN DEPT. SEY . CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/20/2013
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE RE: SUMMONS & COMPLAINT FILED. SERVED AS TO (GARCIA, ERIC) . COSTS OF $ 39.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/13/2013
  • DocketCOLLECTIONS CASE COMPLAINT FILED PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740. RN NOR437743014. Filing Fee: 225.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/13/2013
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/13/2013
  • DocketSUMMONS FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less