This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/12/2022 at 21:44:34 (UTC).

WELLS FARGO BANK VS DEGANTE, MARIO

Case Summary

On 05/03/2013 WELLS FARGO BANK filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against DEGANTE, MARIO. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Norwalk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is HOWARD HALM. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****3552

  • Filing Date:

    05/03/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

HOWARD HALM

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WELLS FARGO BANK NA

Defendant

DEGANTE MARIO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MIGUEL CHRISTOPHER A.

 

Court Documents

Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment - Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment Full

6/30/2017: Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment - Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment Full

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/30/2017
  • DocketACKNOWLEDGMENT OF FULL SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT FILED .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/30/2015
  • DocketNOTICE OF STAY OF PROCEEDINGS RE: BANKRUPTCY FILED BY (DEGANTE, MARIO),AN INDIVIDUAL . ALL FURTHER PROCEEDINGS STAYED AS TO (DEGANTE, MARIO),AN INDIVIDUAL ONLY.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/27/2014
  • DocketABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT ISSUED. ATTY'S BOX (EDP) . RECEIPT # NOR486137070 .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/20/2014
  • DocketJUDGMENT DEFAULT BY CLERK ENTERED AS FOLLOWS:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/20/2014
  • DocketJUDGMENT ENTERED AS A FINAL DISPOSITION ON 02/20/14 . FOR (WELLS FARGO BANK), NA . AGAINST (DEGANTE, MARIO),AN INDIVIDUAL . PRINCIPAL $ 8394.24 . ATTORNEY FEES $ 593.65 . INTEREST $ 0.00 . COSTS $ 264.00 . TOTAL $ 9,251.89 .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/15/2014
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT RECEIVED AS TO (DEGANTE, MARIO),AN INDIVIDUAL .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/15/2014
  • DocketDECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF JUDGMENT FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/15/2014
  • DocketREQUEST FILED AND DEFAULT ENTERED OF (DEGANTE, MARIO),AN INDIVIDUAL . DECLARATION UNDER 585.5 CCP, DECLARATION PURSUANT TO 587 CCP, MEMO OF COSTS, AND DECLARATION OF NON-MILITARY STATUS FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/15/2014
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT BY CLERK FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/15/2014
  • DocketDISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE FILED AS TO DOES / ROES 1-100 , [INCLUSIVE] ONLY.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 06/06/2013
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS & COMPLAINT; OSC/CASE MANAGEMENT REVIEW NOTICE, NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT, ADR PACKAGE FILED. SERVED AS TO (DEGANTE, MARIO),AN INDIVIDUAL . COSTS OF $ 39.00 .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/03/2013
  • DocketORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING SIGNED AND FILED BY HOWARD HALM TO SHOW WHY SANCTIONS SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO FILE REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740(F). MATTER CONTINUED FOR HEARING ON 05/03/16 AT 08:30A M., IN DEPT. SEY . CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED, GIVEN TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/ COUNSEL.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/03/2013
  • DocketORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING SIGNED AND FILED BY HOWARD HALM TO SHOW WHY SANCTIONS SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO FILE REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740(F). MATTER CONTINUED FOR HEARING ON 05/03/16 AT 08:30A M., IN DEPT. SEY . CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED, GIVEN TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/ COUNSEL.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2013
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS & COMPLAINT; OSC/CASE MANAGEMENT REVIEW NOTICE, NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT, ADR PACKAGE FILED. SERVED AS TO (DEGANTE, MARIO),AN INDIVIDUAL . COSTS OF $ 39.00 .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2013
  • DocketORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING/CASE MANAGEMENT REVIEW SIGNED AND FILED BY HOWARD HALM TO SHOW WHY SANCTIONS SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740(E). MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON 11/04/13 AT 08:30A M., IN DEPT. SEY . CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2013
  • DocketORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING/CASE MANAGEMENT REVIEW SIGNED AND FILED BY HOWARD HALM TO SHOW WHY SANCTIONS SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740(E). MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON 11/04/13 AT 08:30A M., IN DEPT. SEY . CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2013
  • DocketCOLLECTIONS CASE COMPLAINT FILED PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740. RN NOR437743019. Filing Fee: 225.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2013
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2013
  • DocketSUMMONS FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2013
  • DocketDECLARATION RE: VENUE FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LANG, RICHERT & PATCH - CHRISTOPHER A. MIGUEL