This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/08/2022 at 04:35:57 (UTC).

WELLS FARGO BANK, NA VS VICTORIA, EVETTE

Case Summary

On 05/03/2013 WELLS FARGO BANK, NA filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against VICTORIA, EVETTE. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Norwalk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are JOSEPH R PORRAS, HOWARD L. HALM and HOWARD HALM. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****3542

  • Filing Date:

    05/03/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

JOSEPH R PORRAS

Judges

HOWARD L. HALM

HOWARD HALM

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WELLS FARGO BANK NA

Defendant

VICTORIA EVETTE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MIGUEL CHRISTOPHER A.

 

Court Documents

Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest

1/10/2018: Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest

Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

1/10/2018: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/10/2018
  • DocketNotice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by: CHRISTOPHER A. MIGUEL (Attorney)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2018
  • DocketMemorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest; Filed by: NA WELLS FARGO BANK (Plaintiff); As to: EVETTE VICTORIA (Defendant); Costs: 0.00; Interest: 0.00; Credits: 1,228.52; Service Date: 01/05/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/07/2015
  • DocketMINUTE ORDER - CAUSE CALLED AT 08:30A M, IN DEPT. SEY , HON. JOSEPH R PORRAS, JUDGE PRESIDING FOR COURT TRIAL. PLAINTIFF(S) APPEARING BY GREGORY KECHICHIAN ESQ. (PRESENT SPECIALLY APPEARING) . DEFENDANT(S) FAILING TO APPEAR.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/07/2015
  • DocketCOURT ORDERS JUDGMENT ENTERED AS FOLLOWS :

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/07/2015
  • DocketJUDGMENT ENTERED AS A FINAL DISPOSITION ON 04/07/15 . FOR (WELLS FARGO BANK, NA) . AGAINST (VICTORIA, EVETTE) AN INDIVIDUAL . PRINCIPAL $ 13017.38 . ATTORNEY FEES $ 780.52 . INTEREST $ 0.00 . COSTS $ 448.00 . TOTAL $ 14,245.90 .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/07/2015
  • DocketCLERK'S NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT & NOTICE RE: EXHIBITS/ DEPOSITION ISSUED. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/07/2015
  • DocketCASE FILE RETURNED TO CIVIL DEPARTMENT FROM COURTROOM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/07/2015
  • DocketMINUTE ORDER - CAUSE CALLED AT 08:30A M, IN DEPT. SEY , HON. JOSEPH R PORRAS, JUDGE PRESIDING FOR COURT TRIAL. PLAINTIFF(S) APPEARING BY GREGORY KECHICHIAN ESQ. (PRESENT SPECIALLY APPEARING) . DEFENDANT(S) FAILING TO APPEAR.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/19/2015
  • DocketMINUTE ORDER - CAUSE CALLED AT 08:30A M, IN DEPT. SEY , HON. JOSEPH R PORRAS, JUDGE PRESIDING FOR COURT TRIAL. DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR A CONTINUANCE IS GRANTED OVER PLAINTIFF'S OBJECTION. MATTER CONTINUED FOR COURT TRIAL TO 04/07/15 AT 08:30A M, IN DEPT. SEY . NOTICE WAIVED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/19/2015
  • DocketMINUTE ORDER - CAUSE CALLED AT 08:30A M, IN DEPT. SEY , HON. JOSEPH R PORRAS, JUDGE PRESIDING FOR COURT TRIAL. DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR A CONTINUANCE IS GRANTED OVER PLAINTIFF'S OBJECTION. MATTER CONTINUED FOR COURT TRIAL TO 04/07/15 AT 08:30A M, IN DEPT. SEY . NOTICE WAIVED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 01/10/2014
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE RE: SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT FILED. SERVED AS TO (VICTORIA, EVETTE) AN INDIVIDUAL ON 12/26/13 . COSTS OF $ 39.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/25/2013
  • DocketORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING SIGNED AND FILED BY HOWARD L. HALM, JUDGE TO SHOW WHY SANCTIONS SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO FILE REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740(F). MATTER CONTINUED FOR HEARING ON 05/03/16 AT 08:30A M., IN DEPT. SEY . CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED, GIVEN TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/ COUNSEL.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/25/2013
  • DocketORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING SIGNED AND FILED BY HOWARD L. HALM, JUDGE TO SHOW WHY SANCTIONS SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO FILE REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740(F). MATTER CONTINUED FOR HEARING ON 05/03/16 AT 08:30A M., IN DEPT. SEY . CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED, GIVEN TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/ COUNSEL.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/28/2013
  • Docket1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED. AND FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/21/2013
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS & COMPLAINT; OSC/CASE MANAGEMENT REVIEW NOTICE, NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT, ADR PACKAGE FILED. SERVED AS TO (VICTORIA, EVETTE) AN INDIVIDUAL . COSTS OF $ 39.00 .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/07/2013
  • DocketORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING/CASE MANAGEMENT REVIEW SIGNED AND FILED BY HOWARD HALM TO SHOW WHY SANCTIONS SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740(E). MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON 11/04/13 AT 08:30A M., IN DEPT. SEY . CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/07/2013
  • DocketORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING/CASE MANAGEMENT REVIEW SIGNED AND FILED BY HOWARD HALM TO SHOW WHY SANCTIONS SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740(E). MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON 11/04/13 AT 08:30A M., IN DEPT. SEY . CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2013
  • DocketCOLLECTIONS CASE COMPLAINT FILED PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740. RN NOR437743008. Filing Fee: 370.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2013
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2013
  • DocketSUMMONS FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LANG, RICHERT & PATCH - CHRISTOPHER A. MIGUEL