This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/07/2022 at 05:24:22 (UTC).

WELLS FARGO BANK, NA VS SINAPI, ROSALIE

Case Summary

On 05/03/2013 WELLS FARGO BANK, NA filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against SINAPI, ROSALIE. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Norwalk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are HOWARD L. HALM and HOWARD HALM. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****3547

  • Filing Date:

    05/03/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judges

HOWARD L. HALM

HOWARD HALM

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WELLS FARGO BANK NA

Defendant

SINAPI ROSALIE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MIGUEL CHRISTOPHER A.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/04/2015
  • DocketACKNOWLEDGMENT OF FULL SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT FILED .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2014
  • DocketABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT ISSUED. ATTY. SVCS . RECEIPT # NOR486137068 .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/26/2013
  • DocketJUDGMENT PURSUANT TO STIPULATION SIGNED AND FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/26/2013
  • DocketJUDGMENT ENTERED AS A FINAL DISPOSITION ON 11/26/13 . FOR (WELLS FARGO BANK, NA) . AGAINST (SINAPI, ROSALIE) AN INDIVIDUAL . PRINCIPAL $ 6357.25 . ATTORNEY FEES $ 471.44 . INTEREST $ 0.00 . COSTS $ 519.00 . TOTAL $ 7,347.69 .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/26/2013
  • DocketCASE FILE RETURNED TO CIVIL DEPARTMENT FROM COURTROOM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2013
  • DocketCASE FILE FORWARDED TO DEPARTMENT SEY FOR CONSIDERATION RE: STIPULATION FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT; PROPOSED ORDER SUBMITTED .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2013
  • DocketSTIPULATION RE: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED. RECEIPT # NOR510917015 .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/03/2013
  • DocketREJECT SHEET SENT TO (WELLS FARGO BANK, NA) FOR REJECTION OF STIPULATION FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT EACH PARTY MUST SIGN THE STIPULATION. AN ATTORNEY CANNOT SIGN ON BEHALF ON PARTY SUBMITTED ON 09/03/13

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/03/2013
  • DocketDISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE FILED AS TO DOES / ROES 1 TO 100 , [INCLUSIVE] ONLY.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/25/2013
  • DocketORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING SIGNED AND FILED BY HOWARD L. HALM, JUDGE TO SHOW WHY SANCTIONS SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO FILE REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740(F). MATTER CONTINUED FOR HEARING ON 05/03/16 AT 08:30A M., IN DEPT. SEY . CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED, GIVEN TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/ COUNSEL.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/25/2013
  • DocketORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING SIGNED AND FILED BY HOWARD L. HALM, JUDGE TO SHOW WHY SANCTIONS SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO FILE REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740(F). MATTER CONTINUED FOR HEARING ON 05/03/16 AT 08:30A M., IN DEPT. SEY . CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED, GIVEN TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/ COUNSEL.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/21/2013
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS & COMPLAINT; OSC/CASE MANAGEMENT REVIEW NOTICE, NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT, ADR PACKAGE FILED. SERVED AS TO (SINAPI, ROSALIE) AN INDIVIDUAL BY LEAVING WITH MARIA DOE . COSTS OF $ 39.00 .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/07/2013
  • DocketORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING/CASE MANAGEMENT REVIEW SIGNED AND FILED BY HOWARD HALM TO SHOW WHY SANCTIONS SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740(E). MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON 11/04/13 AT 08:30A M., IN DEPT. SEY . CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/07/2013
  • DocketORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING/CASE MANAGEMENT REVIEW SIGNED AND FILED BY HOWARD HALM TO SHOW WHY SANCTIONS SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740(E). MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON 11/04/13 AT 08:30A M., IN DEPT. SEY . CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2013
  • DocketCOLLECTIONS CASE COMPLAINT FILED PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740. RN NOR437743013. Filing Fee: 225.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2013
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2013
  • DocketSUMMONS FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LANG, RICHERT & PATCH - CHRISTOPHER A. MIGUEL