This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/08/2022 at 04:36:04 (UTC).

WELLS FARGO BANK, NA VS. ORTIZ, ELIZABETH A.

Case Summary

On 05/03/2013 WELLS FARGO BANK, NA filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against ORTIZ, ELIZABETH A. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Norwalk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are HOWARD L. HALM and HOWARD HALM. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****3543

  • Filing Date:

    05/03/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judges

HOWARD L. HALM

HOWARD HALM

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WELLS FARGO BANK NA

Defendant

ORTIZ ELIZABETH A.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

QUALL CARDOT LLP - CHRISTOPHER A. MIGUEL

Attorney at QUALL CARDOT LLP

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/15/2016
  • DocketCASE FILE ORDERED DESTROYED PER SECTION(S) 71008 AND/OR68152 OF THE GOVERNMENT CODE.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/15/2016
  • DocketPURSUANT TO COURT ORDER THE CASE FILE WAS DESTROYED ON04/15/16 . CASE SET TO BE PURGED FROM THE SYSTEM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/13/2014
  • DocketDISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE FILED FOR THE ENTIRE ACTION ASTO ALL DEFENDANT(S) AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION(S).

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2014
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE RE: SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT FILED. SERVEDAS TO (ORTIZ, ELIZABETH A.) , SUB-SERVED BY LEAVING WITHRUBEN DOE (OCCUPANT) ON 1/3/14 . COSTS OF $ 39.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/26/2013
  • DocketORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING SIGNED AND FILED BY HOWARD L.HALM, JUDGE TO SHOW WHY SANCTIONS SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSEDFOR FAILURE TO FILE REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENTPURSUANT TO CRC 3.740(F). MATTER CONTINUED FOR HEARINGON 05/03/16 AT 08:30A M., IN DEPT. SEY . CERTIFICATEOF MAILING FILED, GIVEN TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/ COUNSEL.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/28/2013
  • Docket1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED. AND FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/14/2013
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS & COMPLAINT; OSC/CASEMANAGEMENT REVIEW NOTICE, NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT, ADRPACKAGE FILED. SERVED AS TO (ORTIZ, ELIZABETH A.) BYLEAVING WITH GUADALUPE DOE . COSTS OF $ 39.00 .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/07/2013
  • DocketORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING/CASE MANAGEMENT REVIEW SIGNEDAND FILED BY HOWARD HALM TO SHOW WHY SANCTIONS SHOULDNOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICEPURSUANT TO CRC 3.740(E). MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON11/04/13 AT 08:30A M., IN DEPT. SEY . CERTIFICATE OFMAILING FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2013
  • DocketCOLLECTIONS CASE COMPLAINT FILED PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740. RNNOR437743009.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2013
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2013
  • DocketSUMMONS FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LANG, RICHERT & PATCH - CHRISTOPHER A. MIGUEL