This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/12/2022 at 16:58:54 (UTC).

WELLS FARGO BANK, NA VS MOFFETT, DOUGLAS J

Case Summary

On 05/03/2013 WELLS FARGO BANK, NA filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against MOFFETT, DOUGLAS J. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Norwalk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are HOWARD HALM and HOWARD L. HALM. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****3546

  • Filing Date:

    05/03/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judges

HOWARD HALM

HOWARD L. HALM

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WELLS FARGO BANK NA

Defendant

MOFFETT DOUGLAS J

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MIGUEL CHRISTOPHER A.

 

Court Documents

Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest - Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest

10/9/2018: Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest - Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/02/2018
  • DocketWrit of Execution (Los Angeles); Issued by: Clerk; County: Los Angeles; Principal: 14,948.85; Interest: 0.00; Costs: 14,973.85

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/09/2018
  • DocketMemorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest; Filed by: NA WELLS FARGO BANK (Plaintiff); As to: DOUGLAS J MOFFETT (Defendant); Costs: 0.00; Interest: 0.00; Credits: 1,209.00; Service Date: 09/12/18

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2017
  • DocketACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT IN THE AMOUNT OF $ 1209.00 FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2017
  • DocketNOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS FOR ATTORNEY FOR PLAINTIFF (WELLS FARGO BANK, NA) FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/02/2014
  • DocketJUDGMENT DEFAULT BY CLERK ENTERED AS FOLLOWS:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/02/2014
  • DocketJUDGMENT ENTERED AS A FINAL DISPOSITION ON 07/02/14 . FOR (WELLS FARGO BANK, NA) . AGAINST (MOFFETT, DOUGLAS J) AN INDIVIDUAL . PRINCIPAL $ 14948.85 . ATTORNEY FEES $ 800.00 . INTEREST $ .00 . COSTS $ 409.00 . TOTAL $ 16,157.85 .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/26/2014
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT RECEIVED AS TO (MOFFETT, DOUGLAS J) .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/26/2014
  • DocketREQUEST FILED AND DEFAULT ENTERED OF (MOFFETT, DOUGLAS J) AN INDIVIDUAL . DECLARATION UNDER 585.5 CCP, DECLARATION PURSUANT TO 587 CCP, MEMO OF COSTS, AND DECLARATION OF NON-MILITARY STATUS FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/26/2014
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT BY CLERK FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/26/2014
  • DocketDISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE FILED AS TO DOES / ROES 1-100 , [INCLUSIVE] ONLY.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 08/29/2013
  • DocketORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING SIGNED AND FILED BY HOWARD L. HALM, JUDGE TO SHOW WHY SANCTIONS SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO FILE REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740(F). MATTER CONTINUED FOR HEARING ON 05/03/16 AT 08:30A M., IN DEPT. SEY . CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED, GIVEN TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/ COUNSEL.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/25/2013
  • DocketCASE FILE FORWARDED TO FILE BACKS RM 714 RE: FILE BACKS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/29/2013
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE RE: SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT FILED. SERVED AS TO DOUGLAS J. MOFFETT, AN INDIVIDUAL BY LISLEY DOE SISTER . COSTS OF $ 39.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/28/2013
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT FILED. SERVED AS TO (MOFFETT, DOUGLAS J) .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/28/2013
  • Docket1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED. AND FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/07/2013
  • DocketORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING/CASE MANAGEMENT REVIEW SIGNED AND FILED BY HOWARD HALM TO SHOW WHY SANCTIONS SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740(E). MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON 11/04/13 AT 08:30A M., IN DEPT. SEY . CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/07/2013
  • DocketORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING/CASE MANAGEMENT REVIEW SIGNED AND FILED BY HOWARD HALM TO SHOW WHY SANCTIONS SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740(E). MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON 11/04/13 AT 08:30A M., IN DEPT. SEY . CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2013
  • DocketCOLLECTIONS CASE COMPLAINT FILED PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740. RN NOR437743012. Filing Fee: 370.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2013
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2013
  • DocketSUMMONS FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LANG, RICHERT & PATCH - CHRISTOPHER A. MIGUEL